Moore v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Victoria Moore
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2020cv03125
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER finding as moot #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The party was previously granted pauper status. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 12/8/20. (cg)
December 4, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(cg)(Sent to plaintiff with Pauper Letter)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 12/3/20. (cg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/4/2020: #1 Pauper Letter) (cg).
December 2, 2020 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Victoria Moore. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. (cwa)
December 2, 2020 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration filed by Victoria Moore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(cwa)
November 30, 2020 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Victoria Moore. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. (mp)
November 30, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration filed by Victoria Moore.(mp)
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 12/9/2020. (mp)
November 17, 2020 Filing 2 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Victoria Moore. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. (mp)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 DEFICIENT: COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration filed by Victoria Moore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?