Lefkowitz v. GEICO Advantage Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Ms Jane Anne Lefkowitz and Jane Anne Lefkowitz
Defendant: GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, Mr Connor Toes, GEICO INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY and Connor Toes
Case Number: 2:2020cv03247
Filed: December 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE Regarding Local Civil Rule 54.7. (sa)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 12/11/2020. (sa)
December 10, 2020 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with Exhibit Attachments by Jane Anne Lefkowitz. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit - Short Form Application, #3 Exhibits from CDC for Orleans Parish, #4 Complaint)(Varrecchio, Dominic) Modified text on 12/11/2020 (jls).
December 7, 2020 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with attached Proposed Order, Statement of Income, Civil Cover Sheet and Complaint-Petition for Damages. **(1) Corrected complaint provided to clerk and original document replaced at rec. docs. 1 and 2-4. **(2) Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis referred to the Magistrate Judge. **(3) Civil Cover Sheet should have been filed as a separate docket entry instead of an attachment. The form was flattened and replaced at doc. 2-3 and also filed separately at rec. doc. 5. No further action necessary.** (jls)
December 7, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Insurance Company, Connor Toes. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(jls)
December 7, 2020 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted. (jls)
December 7, 2020 Filing 4 Request of Summons Issued as to GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Insurance Company, and Connor Toes filed by Jane Anne Lefkowitz re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Varrecchio, Dominic) Modified text on 12/7/2020 (jls).
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (go)
December 7, 2020 Filing 2 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with attached Proposed Order, Statement of Income (Short Form), Civil Cover Sheet and Complaint by Jane Anne Lefkowitz. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Statement - Short Form Application, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Complaint)(Varrecchio, Dominic) (Attachment 3 replaced to flatten on 12/7/2020) (jls). (Attachment 4 replaced with corrected version on 12/7/2020) (jls). Modified text/referred on 12/7/2020 (jls). Modified on 12/8/2020 (sa).
December 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (In Forma Pauperis status requested) filed by Jane Anne Lefkowitz. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Short Form) Attorney Dominic Nicholas Varrecchio added to party Jane Anne Lefkowitz(pty:pla).(Varrecchio, Dominic) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/7/2020) (jls).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lefkowitz v. GEICO Advantage Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms Jane Anne Lefkowitz
Represented By: Dominic Nicholas Varrecchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Anne Lefkowitz
Represented By: Dominic Nicholas Varrecchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Advantage Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Connor Toes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connor Toes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?