Smart Media, LLC v. Infinity Science Center, Inc.
Plaintiff: Smart Media, LLC
Defendant: INFINITY Science Center and Infinity Science Center, Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv03406
Filed: December 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Susie Morgan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Smart Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melasky, Mark)
February 8, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO #5 SHOW CAUSE ORDER by Smart Media, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Melasky, Mark) Modified text, added link on 2/8/2021 (sbs).
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SHOW CAUSE ORDER - Plaintiff(s) Smart Media, LLC, represents that service has been made upon defendant(s) Infinity Science Center, Inc. The record reflects that no responsive pleadings have been filed by said defendant(s). IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiff(s) move for entry of default against said defendant(s) under Rule 55 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or show good cause in writing within 20 days why these defendant(s) should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 1/19/2021.(sbs)
January 7, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Infinity Science Center, Inc served on 12/22/2020, answer due 1/12/2021. (Melasky, Mark)
December 16, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Infinity Science Center, Inc. (bm)
December 16, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (aj)
December 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Infinity Science Center, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8645038) filed by Smart Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)Attorney Mark Norman Melasky added to party Smart Media, LLC(pty:pla).(Melasky, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2020: #6 AO Form 121) (bm). Modified text on 12/16/2020 (bm). (Attachment 6 replaced on 12/16/2020) (bm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smart Media, LLC v. Infinity Science Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smart Media, LLC
Represented By: Mark Norman Melasky
Represented By: Gregory D. Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INFINITY Science Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity Science Center, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?