Woods v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Karriem Abdullah Woods
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2020cv03423
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Social Security Administration served on 2/1/2021, answer due 4/9/2021. (Spurlock, Paul)
February 12, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Social Security Administration served on 2/3/2021, answer due 4/9/2021. (Spurlock, Paul)
February 12, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Social Security Administration served on 2/8/2021, answer due 4/9/2021. (Spurlock, Paul)
January 14, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(mp)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on January 13, 2021. (mp)
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (go)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Karriem Abdullah Woods. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Application, #2 Proposed Order)(Spurlock, Paul) Modified text/referral on 12/21/2020 (bm).
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (In Forma Pauperis status requested) filed by Karriem Abdullah Woods. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Commissioner, #3 Summons Attorney General, #4 Summons U.S. Attorney)Attorney Paul Brian Spurlock added to party Karriem Abdullah Woods(pty:pla).(Spurlock, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karriem Abdullah Woods
Represented By: Paul Brian Spurlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?