Brown v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Michelle Marie Brown
Defendant: Comm. of SSA Andrew Saul and Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2020cv03424
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Social Security Administration served on 1/11/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed- US Attorney, #2 Summons Returned Executed/US AG)(Breuer, Wiebke)
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(jeg)
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the summons. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (go)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 Request of Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul filed by Michelle Marie Brown re #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Summons US Attorney General, #2 Summons US Attorney)(Breuer, Wiebke)
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8649682) filed by Michelle Marie Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Commissioner SSA, #3 Summons US Attorney, #4 Summons US Attorney General)Attorney Wiebke Breuer added to party Michelle Marie Brown(pty:pla).(Breuer, Wiebke) (Attachments 2-4 replaced on 12/21/2020) (jeg). Modified text/attachment description on 12/21/2020 (jeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comm. of SSA Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Marie Brown
Represented By: Wiebke Breuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?