Garcia v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Alice Garcia
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, CBS Corporation, John Crane Inc., The McCarty Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Maryland Casualty Company, Bayer CropScience, Inc., General Electric Company, Eagle, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., International Paper Company, McCarty Corporation, Northrup Grumman Ship Systems, Inc., Eagle Asbestos & Packing Company, Inc., Zurich American Insurance Company, John Crane Inc, Amchem Products, Inc., Westinghouse Electric Company, Avondale Marine Ways, Inc., Avondale Industries, Inc., Benjamin Foster Co, Northrup Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc., Avondale Shipyards, Inc and McCarty-Branton
Case Number: 2:2020cv03463
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Michael North
2 Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2021 Filing 59 ANSWER to #2 Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. Attorney Magali Ann Puente-Martin added to party Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation(pty:crd).(Puente-Martin, Magali)
February 19, 2021 Filing 58 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Plaintiff's Petition for Damages by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. Attorney Magali Ann Puente-Martin added to party Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation(pty:dft).(Puente-Martin, Magali)
February 19, 2021 Filing 57 ANSWER to #2 Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by General Electric Company. Attorney Magali Ann Puente-Martin added to party General Electric Company(pty:crd).(Puente-Martin, Magali)
February 19, 2021 Filing 56 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Plaintiff's Petition for Damages by General Electric Company. Attorney Magali Ann Puente-Martin added to party General Electric Company(pty:dft).(Puente-Martin, Magali)
February 18, 2021 Filing 55 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Plaintiff's Petition for Damages by McCarty Corporation.(Redfearn, Douglas)
February 15, 2021 Filing 54 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by John Crane Inc identifying Corporate Parent Smiths Group, plc for John Crane Inc (Corb, Natasha)
February 15, 2021 Filing 53 ANSWER to #2 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal,, Crossclaim, by John Crane Inc.Attorney Natasha Amber Corb added to party John Crane Inc(pty:crd).(Corb, Natasha)
February 15, 2021 Filing 52 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by John Crane Inc.Attorney Natasha Amber Corb added to party John Crane Inc(pty:dft).(Corb, Natasha)
February 12, 2021 Filing 51 ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff by International Paper Company.(Stewart, Amber)
February 12, 2021 Filing 50 ANSWER to #2 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal,, Crossclaim, of Huntington Ingalls, Incorporated by International Paper Company.(Stewart, Amber)
February 9, 2021 Filing 49 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #48 Answer to Crossclaim, Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, #47 Answer to Crossclaim, Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal. **Document contains incorrect Section letter. All future pleadings must reflect Section T Judge Greg Gerard Guidry.** (mm)
February 8, 2021 Filing 48 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Crossclaim by Union Carbide Corporation. Attorney David M. Stein added to party Union Carbide Corporation(pty:crd), Attorney David M. Stein added to party Union Carbide Corporation(pty:dft).(Stein, David)
February 8, 2021 Filing 47 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Crossclaim by Bayer CropScience, Inc. Attorney David M. Stein added to party Bayer CropScience, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David M. Stein added to party Bayer CropScience, Inc.(pty:crd).(Stein, David)
February 8, 2021 Filing 46 Summons Issued as to Bayer CropScience, Inc., CBS Corporation, Eagle, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, General Electric Company, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, International Paper Company, John Crane Inc, Maryland Casualty Company, McCarty Corporation, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(bm)
February 5, 2021 Filing 45 Request of Summons Issued as to Union Carbide Corporation filed by Alice Garcia re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Colley, Christopher)
February 5, 2021 Filing 44 Request of Summons Issued as to Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. filed by Alice Garcia re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Colley, Christopher)
February 5, 2021 Filing 43 Request of Summons Issued as to McCarty Corporation filed by Alice Garcia re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Colley, Christopher)
February 5, 2021 Filing 42 Request of Summons Issued as to Maryland Casualty Company filed by Alice Garcia re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Colley, Christopher)
February 5, 2021 Filing 41 Request of Summons Issued as to John Crane Inc filed by Alice Garcia re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Colley, Christopher)
February 5, 2021 Filing 40 Request of Summons Issued as to International Paper Company filed by Alice Garcia re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Colley, Christopher)
February 5, 2021 Filing 39 Request of Summons Issued as to Huntington Ingalls Incorporated filed by Alice Garcia re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Colley, Christopher)
February 5, 2021 Filing 38 Request of Summons Issued as to General Electric Company filed by Alice Garcia re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Colley, Christopher)
February 5, 2021 Filing 37 Request of Summons Issued as to Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation filed by Alice Garcia re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Colley, Christopher)
February 5, 2021 Filing 36 Request of Summons Issued as to Eagle, Inc. filed by Alice Garcia re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Colley, Christopher)
February 5, 2021 Filing 35 Request of Summons Issued as to CBS Corporation filed by Alice Garcia re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Colley, Christopher)
February 5, 2021 Filing 34 Request of Summons Issued as to Bayer CropScience, Inc. filed by Alice Garcia re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Colley, Christopher)
January 29, 2021 Filing 33 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #32 Answer to Crossclaim. **1. Document contains incorrect Section. All future pleadings must reflect Section T Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. 2. Filing attorney should have linked filing to Document 2. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm)
January 29, 2021 Filing 32 ANSWER to #2 Crossclaim with Jury Demand by Zurich American Insurance Company.(Kemmerly, McNeil) Modified text/added linkage on 1/29/2021 (mm).
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Cross-Claim as to International Paper Company answer due 2/16/2021. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 01/29/2021. (ko)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 MOTION to Strike #27 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant International Paper Company's Motion is stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 01/29/2021.(ko)
January 27, 2021 Filing 29 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Crossclaim, of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by International Paper Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Penn, Elizabeth) Modified text on 1/28/2021 (bm).
January 27, 2021 Filing 28 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Strike #27 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by International Paper Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Penn, Elizabeth) Modified text on 1/28/2021 (bm).
January 27, 2021 Filing 27 **STRICKEN PER ORDER AT REC. DOC. 30** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by International Paper Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stewart, Amber) Modified on 1/29/2021 (ko).
January 26, 2021 Filing 26 DEFICIENT EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Crossclaim, of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by International Paper Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Amber L. Stewart added to party International Paper Company(pty:dft).(Stewart, Amber) Modified text on 1/27/2021 (lt).
January 26, 2021 Filing 25 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by International Paper Company (Stewart, Amber)
January 26, 2021 Filing 24 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Eagle, Inc. (Redfearn, Douglas)
January 26, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Eagle, Inc. Attorney Douglas Watson Redfearn added to party Eagle, Inc.(pty:dft).(Redfearn, Douglas)
January 26, 2021 Filing 22 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by McCarty Corporation (Redfearn, Douglas)
January 26, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to #2 Crossclaim by McCarty Corporation. Attorney Douglas Watson Redfearn added to party McCarty Corporation(pty:crd).(Redfearn, Douglas)
January 25, 2021 Filing 20 DEFICIENT: ANSWER to 2 Crossclaim with Jury Demand by Maryland Casualty Company. Attorney McNeil James Kemmerly added to party Maryland Casualty Company(pty:crd).(Kemmerly, McNeil) Modified text on 1/25/2021 (mm).
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF RECUSAL. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court reallot this matter to another Section of this Court. Judge Wendy B Vitter recused. Case reassigned to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 12/29/2020.(jeg) (NEF: Sections D and T)
December 29, 2020 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Bayer CropScience, Inc., CBS Corporation, Eagle, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, General Electric Company, International Paper Company, John Crane Inc., Maryland Casualty Company, McCarty Corporation, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(lt)
December 29, 2020 Filing 17 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated (Melancon, David)
December 29, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Compliance by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Melancon, David)
December 29, 2020 Filing 15 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (lt)
December 29, 2020 Filing 14 Request of Summons Issued as to Union Carbide Corporation filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #2 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal,, Crossclaim,. (Melancon, David)
December 29, 2020 Filing 13 Request of Summons Issued as to Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #2 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal,, Crossclaim,. (Melancon, David)
December 29, 2020 Filing 12 Request of Summons Issued as to The McCarty Corporation filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #2 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal,, Crossclaim,. (Melancon, David)
December 29, 2020 Filing 11 Request of Summons Issued as to Maryland Casualty Company filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #2 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal,, Crossclaim,. (Melancon, David)
December 29, 2020 Filing 10 Request of Summons Issued as to John Crane Inc. filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #2 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal,, Crossclaim,. (Melancon, David)
December 29, 2020 Filing 9 Request of Summons Issued as to International Paper Company filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #2 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal,, Crossclaim,. (Melancon, David)
December 29, 2020 Filing 8 Request of Summons Issued as to General Electric Company filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #2 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal,, Crossclaim,. (Melancon, David)
December 29, 2020 Filing 7 Request of Summons Issued as to Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #2 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal,, Crossclaim,. (Melancon, David)
December 29, 2020 Filing 6 Request of Summons Issued as to Eagle, Inc. filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #2 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal,, Crossclaim,. (Melancon, David)
December 29, 2020 Filing 5 Request of Summons Issued as to CBS Corporation filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #2 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal,, Crossclaim,. (Melancon, David)
December 29, 2020 Filing 4 Request of Summons Issued as to Bayer CropScience, Inc. filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #2 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal,, Crossclaim,. (Melancon, David)
December 28, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (go)
December 28, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM with Jury Demand against Bayer CropScience, Inc., CBS Corporation, Eagle, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, General Electric Company, International Paper Company, John Crane Inc., Maryland Casualty Company, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., The McCarty Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.(Melancon, David)
December 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Parish of Orleans, case number 2020-11051, B-5 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8661490) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft).(Melancon, David) Modified text on 12/29/2020 (lt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Michael Scott Minyard
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Amanda Marie Crowley Fraser
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Whelen
Represented By: Alison A. Spindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The McCarty Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: David M. Stein
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland Casualty Company
Represented By: Lee M. LeBouef
Represented By: Adam D Whitworth
Represented By: McNeil James Kemmerly
Represented By: Marc E. Devenport
Represented By: Edward T. Hayes
Represented By: Alexander B Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Stein
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle, Inc.
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: Douglas Watson Redfearn
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Amber L. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarty Corporation
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: Douglas Watson Redfearn
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrup Grumman Ship Systems, Inc.
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Michael Scott Minyard
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Amanda Marie Crowley Fraser
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Whelen
Represented By: Alison A. Spindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Asbestos & Packing Company, Inc.
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: Douglas Watson Redfearn
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Lee M. LeBouef
Represented By: Adam D Whitworth
Represented By: McNeil James Kemmerly
Represented By: Marc E. Devenport
Represented By: Edward T. Hayes
Represented By: Alexander B Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane Inc
Represented By: Amanda Luella Deto
Represented By: Bradley Adam Hays
Represented By: Glenn Lyle Maximilian Swetman
Represented By: Christopher O. Massenburg
Represented By: Mary A. Reed
Represented By: Natasha Amber Corb
Represented By: Brandie Mendoza Thibodeaux
Represented By: Danielle Mikel Sczesny
Represented By: Jeanette Seraile-Riggins
Represented By: Meghan B. Senter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amchem Products, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Stein
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avondale Marine Ways, Inc.
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Michael Scott Minyard
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Amanda Marie Crowley Fraser
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Whelen
Represented By: Alison A. Spindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avondale Industries, Inc.
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Michael Scott Minyard
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Amanda Marie Crowley Fraser
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Whelen
Represented By: Alison A. Spindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Foster Co
Represented By: David M. Stein
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrup Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc.
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Michael Scott Minyard
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Amanda Marie Crowley Fraser
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Whelen
Represented By: Alison A. Spindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avondale Shipyards, Inc
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Michael Scott Minyard
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Amanda Marie Crowley Fraser
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Whelen
Represented By: Alison A. Spindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarty-Branton
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: Douglas Watson Redfearn
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Garcia
Represented By: Kristopher Lynn Thompson
Represented By: Christopher C. Colley
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: David Ryan Cannella
Represented By: Benjamin David Rumph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?