Dover Bay Specialty Insurance Company v. LG Electronics USA, Inc
Plaintiff: Dover Bay Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: LG Electronics USA, Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv00026
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2021 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 MOTION to Dismiss . **Document marked as Filed in Error. Document was a Duplicate filing of Rec. Doc. 8.** (am) Modified on 2/9/2021 (clc).
February 9, 2021 Filing 8 RULE 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss by LG Electronics USA, Inc. Motion(s) will be submitted on 3/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Notice of Submission)(Noonan, Claire) Modified text on 2/9/2021 (am). Modified text on 2/9/2021 (clc).
February 9, 2021 Filing 7 **FILED IN DUPLICATE- See Rec. Doc. 8** Rule 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss by LG Electronics USA, Inc. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Notice of Submission)(Noonan, Claire) Modified text on 2/9/2021 (am). Modified text on 2/9/2021 (clc).
January 22, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Compliance by LG Electronics USA, Inc re #3 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Record)(Noonan, Claire)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: GRANTING #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 1/19/2021. (am)
January 15, 2021 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by LG Electronics USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Noonan, Claire)
January 8, 2021 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by LG Electronics USA, Inc. (lt)
January 8, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (go)
January 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from 24th JDC, Parish of Jefferson, case number 812-624, Div. A (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8676333) filed by LG Electronics USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) Attorney Claire Adams Noonan added to party LG Electronics USA, Inc(pty:dft).(Noonan, Claire) Modified text on 1/8/2021 (lt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dover Bay Specialty Insurance Company v. LG Electronics USA, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dover Bay Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: William Ransom Pipes
Represented By: Blaine T. Aydell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics USA, Inc
Represented By: John W. Sinnott
Represented By: Gabriel Winsberg
Represented By: Claire Adams Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?