Davis v. Interstate Cleaning Corporation
Plaintiff: Robert Davis
Defendant: The Howard Hughes Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Howard Hughes Corporation, Interstate Cleaning Corporation and Unidentified Party
Case Number: 2:2021cv00104
Filed: January 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Answer to Complaint. Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' OR by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 1.' (bm)
January 27, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint #1 with Jury Demand by Howard Hughes Corporation.(Lawrence, John) Modified text/link on 1/27/2021 (bm).
January 21, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (go)
January 21, 2021 Filing fee received from Robert Davis:receipt LAE065793 $ 402 (cc)
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 Case Filing Fee Not Paid. The mandated filing fee of $402.00 has not been paid. If payment is not received within two business days, the matter will be referred to the assigned judge. (aj)
January 18, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Compliance by The Howard Hughes Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal,,. (Lawrence, John)
January 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2020-09717 Div A Sec 16 (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) filed by Howard Hughes Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 List of Attorneys, #3 List of Pleadings, #4 Notice to Adverse Parties, #5 Removal Certificate, #6 State Court Pleadings State Court No of Removal, #7 State Court Pleadings Petition / Citation / SOP, #8 State Court Pleadings Written Discovery)Attorney John Stafford Lawrence, Jr added to party Howard Hughes Corporation(pty:dft).(Lawrence, John) Modified text on 1/22/2021 (jeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Interstate Cleaning Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Howard Hughes Corporation
Represented By: John Stafford Lawrence, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Hughes Corporation
Represented By: David P. Curlin
Represented By: John Stafford Lawrence, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Cleaning Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Davis
Represented By: Monica Gant Moton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?