Henry et al v. New Orleans City
Plaintiff: Joseph Henry, Francis Falls and Stephan Namisnak
Defendant: New Orleans City
Case Number: 2:2021cv00107
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 4/7/2021, at 2:00 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(tj)
March 8, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by New Orleans City.(Smith, Daniel) Modified text on 3/9/2021 (jls).
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant is granted an additional twenty-one days to file responsive pleadings to the Complaint filed by Plaintiffs. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 2/18/2021. (pp)
February 15, 2021 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by New Orleans City. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Daniel T. Smith added to party New Orleans City(pty:dft).(Smith, Daniel)
February 2, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; New Orleans City served on 1/25/2021, answer due 2/17/2021. (Bizer, Andrew)
January 20, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to New Orleans City. (jls)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (aj)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New Orleans City (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8691592) filed by Joseph Henry, Stephan Namisnak, Francis Falls. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Andrew David Bizer added to party Francis Falls(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew David Bizer added to party Joseph Henry(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew David Bizer added to party Stephan Namisnak(pty:pla).(Bizer, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry et al v. New Orleans City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Henry
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Emily A. Westermeier
Represented By: Garret S DeReus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Falls
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Emily A. Westermeier
Represented By: Garret S DeReus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephan Namisnak
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Emily A. Westermeier
Represented By: Garret S DeReus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans City
Represented By: Corwin St. Raymond
Represented By: Churita H. Hansell
Represented By: Donesia D. Turner
Represented By: Sunni Jones LeBeouf
Represented By: Daniel T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?