United States of America v. Land et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Land and Harold M Avist
Case Number: 2:2021cv00192
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 lc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Order for Delivery of Possession. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/17/2021. (jeg)(1cc: AUSA)
February 9, 2021 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Order for Delivery of Possession by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Schreiber, Glenn)
February 9, 2021 Filing 7 Receipt of Check by United States of America (Schreiber, Glenn)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Deposit Funds as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/3/2021. (jeg) (1cc: Plaintiff, Financial Unit)
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Order for Deposit and Investment of Funds in Registry of Court by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schreiber, Glenn) Modified on 2/3/2021 (jeg).
February 1, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION Pursuant to Declaration of Taking by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Schedules A - G)(Schreiber, Glenn)
January 29, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (ess)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 Declaration by United States of America of Taking (Attachments: #1 Schedules A - G)(Schreiber, Glenn)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Land (Filed on behalf of USA - Filing Fee not required) filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Schedules A - G, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Glenn Kenneth Schreiber added to party United States of America(pty:pla).(Schreiber, Glenn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Land et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold M Avist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Glenn Kenneth Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?