Tedesco v. Pearson Education, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tiffanie Tedesco
Defendant: Pearson Education, Inc., XYZ Insurance Companies and Unidentified Party
Case Number: 2:2021cv00199
Filed: January 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Pearson Education, Inc. on 2/3/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. (Phelps, Hope)
February 2, 2021 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Summons Submitted for Issuance. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Summons. The pdf should have been flattened. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click PRINT to adobe pdf to flatten the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (lt)
February 2, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Pearson Education, Inc. (lt)
February 1, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Phelps, Hope) (Main Document 3 replaced on 2/2/2021) (lt).
February 1, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (ess)
January 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8713711) filed by Tiffanie Tedesco. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Hope A Phelps added to party Tiffanie Tedesco(pty:pla).(Phelps, Hope)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tedesco v. Pearson Education, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pearson Education, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffanie Tedesco
Represented By: Hope A Phelps
Represented By: William Brock Most
Represented By: David Joseph Lanser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?