Brindell et al v. Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Carolyn Brindell, Connie Dupay, Christopher Brindell and John Brindell, III
Defendant: Strick Trailers LLC, Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction Inc., Utility Trailer Manufacturing Co, Pneumo-Abex, LLC, CRA Trailers Inc, Wilson Trailer Co., Lufkin Gears, LLC, Great Dane LLC, Eaton Corporation, ZF Active Safety US Inc, Meritor Inc, Pneumo-Abex Corp., Great Dane Limited Partnership, Kelsey-Hayes Company, Port of New Orleans LLC, United States Fidelilty and Guarantee Company, Board of Commissioners for the Port of New Orleans, Honeywell International, Inc., Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., First State Insurance Company, Eagle Inc., Union Carbide Coporation, Pneumo Abex LLC, Arvinmeritor, Inc., Meritor Automotive, Inc., Great Dane Trailers, Inc. and Lufkin Industries, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00216
Filed: February 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER AND REASONS GRANTING #5 Emergency Motion to Remand to State Court, as set forth in document. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 2/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Remand letter) (jls)
February 17, 2021 Filing 27 Supplement to #1 Notice of Removal, #8 Response to Motion - Exhibit AA, Deposition of Plaintiffs' expert witness, Dr. Brent Staggs - by Eaton Corporation, pursuant to Order at rec. doc. 26. (jls)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING #22 Motion for Leave to Supplement Exhibit. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 2/17/2021. (jls)
February 17, 2021 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Carolyn Brindell, Christopher Brindell, John Brindell, III, Connie Dupay re #5 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jls)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #20 Motion for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum in Support of the Emergency Motion to Remand. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 2/17/2021. (jls)
February 17, 2021 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown: Motion Hearing via videoconferencing held on 2/17/2021 re #5 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court. Argument held. Matter taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Karen Ibos.) (jls)
February 17, 2021 Filing 22 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Supplement Exhibit by Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit AA)(Senter, Meghan) Modified text on 2/17/2021 (jls).
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jacqueline Gagne Badders. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 2/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (jls)
February 16, 2021 Filing 20 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memo in Support of Remand by Carolyn Brindell, Christopher Brindell, John Brindell, III, Connie Dupay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading Reply Memo in Support of Remand, #3 Exhibit)(Cheek, Lindsey)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jean-Michel LeCointre. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 2/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (jls)
February 16, 2021 Filing 18 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jean-Michel Lecointre (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8736580) by Carolyn Brindell, Christopher Brindell, John Brindell, III, Connie Dupay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Cheek, Lindsey) Modified text on 2/16/2021 (jls).
February 16, 2021 Filing 17 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jacqueline G. Badders (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number BLAEDC-8736572) by Carolyn Brindell, Christopher Brindell, John Brindell, III, Connie Dupay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Cheek, Lindsey) Modified text on 2/16/2021 (jls). (Attachment 2 replaced on 2/16/2021) (jls).
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDERED that the #5 Emergency MOTION to Remand is set for oral argument on 2/17/2021 at 9:00 AM via videoconference. Each side will be allotted 15 minutes for the motion. The Court will provide the videoconference login information to all counsel of record by email. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that anyone who wishes to listen to oral arguments, contact chambers for remote access by 2/16/2021 at 3:00 PM. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that everyone remain muted and are prohibited from using the chat feature during oral argument. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that each person granted remote access to the oral argument must abide by the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. A violation of the general prohibition or the order to remain muted and not engage in chat feature may result in sanctionsincluding restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 2/16/2021.(jls)
February 15, 2021 Filing 15 Notice of Compliance by Eaton Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Part 1 of 15, #2 Exhibit A Part 2 of 15, #3 Exhibit A Part 3 of 15, #4 Exhibit A Part 4 of 15, #5 Exhibit A Part 5 of 15, #6 Exhibit A Part 6 of 15, #7 Exhibit A Part 7 of 15, #8 Exhibit A Part 8 of 15, #9 Exhibit A Part 9 of 15, #10 Exhibit A Part 10 of 15, #11 Exhibit A Part 11 of 15, #12 Exhibit A Part 12 of 15, #13 Exhibit A Part 13 of 15, #14 Exhibit A Part 14 of 15, #15 Exhibit A Part 15 of 15, #16 Exhibit B)(Senter, Meghan) Modified text on 2/16/2021 (lt).
February 12, 2021 Filing 14 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Pneumo Abex LLC. Identifiying Corporate Parent Pneumo Abex Asbestos Claims Settlement Trust for Pneumo Abex LLC (Barlow, Amber) Modified filer/text on 2/16/2021 (lt).
February 11, 2021 Filing 13 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Strick Trailers LLC identifying Corporate Parent Diamatrix, Inc. for Strick Trailers LLC (Baxter, Kay)
February 11, 2021 Filing 12 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Utility Trailer Manufacturing Co (Hart, Joseph)
February 11, 2021 Filing 11 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Eaton Corporation, Pneumo Abex, LLC, Utility Trailer Manufacturing Co., Strick Trailers, LLC, CRA Trailers, Inc., and Great Dane LLC. regarding #5 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Senter, Meghan) Modified filers on 2/16/2021 (jls).
February 11, 2021 Filing 10 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Eaton Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Eaton Corporation, plc for Eaton Corporation (Senter, Meghan)
February 11, 2021 Filing 9 Declaration of Meghan B. Senter regarding Compliance with Deadline for Filing Opposition by Eaton Corporation. (Senter, Meghan) Modified text on 2/12/2021 (jls).
February 11, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court, filed by Eaton Corporation, Pneumo Abex, LLC, Utility Trailer Manufacturing Co., Strick Trailers, LLC, CRA Trailers, Inc., and Great Dane LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Senter, Meghan) Modified event/text/filers on 2/12/2021 (jls).
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 MOTION to Expedite #5 Emergency Motion to Remand. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Remand will be brought for submission on 2/17/2021, at 10:00 AM. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT any party opposing Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Remand must file its opposition thereto no later than 2/11/2021 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 2/8/2021.(pp)
February 5, 2021 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Emergency Motion to Remand by Carolyn Brindell, Christopher Brindell, John Brindell, III, Connie Dupay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cheek, Lindsey)
February 5, 2021 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court by Carolyn Brindell, Christopher Brindell, John Brindell, III, Connie Dupay. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Notice of Submission)(Cheek, Lindsey)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. Judge Martin L.C. Feldman, Magistrate Judge Michael North no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 2/4/2021. (NEF: Section G, MAG-5, MAG-3)(cbs)
February 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Carolyn Brindell, Christopher Brindell, John Brindell, III, Connie Dupay. (Cheek, Lindsey) Modified text on 2/4/2021 (cwa).
February 3, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (aj)
February 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Parish of Orleans, case number 19-09716, N-8 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8717842) filed by Eaton Corporation, Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction Inc., Utility Trailer Manufacturing Co, Pneumo-Abex Corp., Strick Trailers LLC, CRA Trailers Inc, Great Dane LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit) Attorney Meghan B. Senter added to party Eaton Corporation(pty:dft).(Senter, Meghan) Modified text/filers on 2/3/2021 (lt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brindell et al v. Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strick Trailers LLC
Represented By: Kay Barnes Baxter
Represented By: Jay Richard Boltin
Represented By: Jonathan David Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction Inc.
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utility Trailer Manufacturing Co
Represented By: Thomas A. Porteous
Represented By: Joseph Henry Hart, IV
Represented By: Daniel E. Oser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo-Abex, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRA Trailers Inc
Represented By: Meghan B. Senter
Represented By: Amanda Luella Deto
Represented By: Bradley Adam Hays
Represented By: Jeanette Seraile-Riggins
Represented By: Christopher O. Massenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson Trailer Co.
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby
Represented By: William Claudy Harrison, Jr.
Represented By: Amber B. Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lufkin Gears, LLC
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Jamie M. Zanovec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Dane LLC
Represented By: Meghan B. Senter
Represented By: Amanda Luella Deto
Represented By: Bradley Adam Hays
Represented By: Jeanette Seraile-Riggins
Represented By: Christopher O. Massenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Meghan B. Senter
Represented By: Amanda Luella Deto
Represented By: Bradley Adam Hays
Represented By: Vikram S. Bhatia
Represented By: Jeanette Seraile-Riggins
Represented By: Christopher O. Massenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF Active Safety US Inc
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby
Represented By: Jason P. Franco
Represented By: William Claudy Harrison, Jr.
Represented By: Amber B. Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meritor Inc
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby
Represented By: Jason P. Franco
Represented By: William Claudy Harrison, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo-Abex Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Dane Limited Partnership
Represented By: Meghan B. Senter
Represented By: Amanda Luella Deto
Represented By: Bradley Adam Hays
Represented By: Jeanette Seraile-Riggins
Represented By: Christopher O. Massenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelsey-Hayes Company
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby
Represented By: Jason P. Franco
Represented By: William Claudy Harrison, Jr.
Represented By: Amber B. Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Port of New Orleans LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fidelilty and Guarantee Company
Represented By: Kristopher T. Wilson
Represented By: Patricia Cowen Penton
Represented By: Katherine Osborne Hannan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Commissioners for the Port of New Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Deirdre Claire McGlinchey
Represented By: Mark N. Bodin
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Represented By: Edward J. Lassus, Jr.
Represented By: Richard J. Garvey, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Kelly Lightfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First State Insurance Company
Represented By: Adrejia LaJoy Ann Boutte
Represented By: John K. Nieset
Represented By: James Aristide Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Inc.
Represented By: Janice M. Culotta
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Represented By: April Ann McQuillar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Coporation
Represented By: Milele N. St. Julien
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: David M. Stein
Represented By: Francis Xavier deBlanc, III
Represented By: Ernest G. Foundas
Represented By: Kathleen Erin Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby
Represented By: William Claudy Harrison, Jr.
Represented By: Amber B. Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvinmeritor, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby
Represented By: Jason P. Franco
Represented By: William Claudy Harrison, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meritor Automotive, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby
Represented By: Jason P. Franco
Represented By: William Claudy Harrison, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Dane Trailers, Inc.
Represented By: Meghan B. Senter
Represented By: Amanda Luella Deto
Represented By: Bradley Adam Hays
Represented By: Jeanette Seraile-Riggins
Represented By: Christopher O. Massenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lufkin Industries, LLC
Represented By: Dawn Danna Marullo
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Burg
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Jamie M. Zanovec
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Brindell
Represented By: Jacqueline Gagne Badders
Represented By: Jean-Michel LeCointre
Represented By: Jeanne Arceneaux
Represented By: Lindsey A. Cheek
Represented By: Bridget B. Truxillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Dupay
Represented By: Jacqueline Gagne Badders
Represented By: Jean-Michel LeCointre
Represented By: Jeanne Arceneaux
Represented By: Lindsey A. Cheek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Brindell
Represented By: Jacqueline Gagne Badders
Represented By: Jean-Michel LeCointre
Represented By: Jeanne Arceneaux
Represented By: Lindsey A. Cheek
Represented By: Bridget B. Truxillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Brindell, III
Represented By: Jacqueline Gagne Badders
Represented By: Jean-Michel LeCointre
Represented By: Jeanne Arceneaux
Represented By: Lindsey A. Cheek
Represented By: Bridget B. Truxillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?