Reynolds v. Louisiana State
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Michael Reynolds
Defendant: Louisiana State and Warden
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Case Number: 2:2021cv00312
Filed: February 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael North
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2021 Filing 7 Receipt of Case Transfer to Middle District of Louisiana (ko)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS #4 as opinion in this matter. IT IS ORDERED that the petition of Jeffrey Michael Reynolds for issuance of a writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2254, is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 3/31/2021.(ajn)
March 24, 2021 Filing 5 OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #4 Report and Recommendations, by Jeffrey Michael Reynolds. (ajn)
March 16, 2021 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) filed by Jeffrey Michael Reynolds. RECOMMENDED that Jeffrey Michael Reynolds habeas petition be transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana. Objections to R&R due by 3/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 3/15/2021. (NEF: Sect A)(caa)
March 8, 2021 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (Filing fee $5 Receipt #LAE066588) filed by Jeffrey Michael Reynolds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Original Petition, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cured Deficiency)(ajn)
February 18, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254). Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 3/11/2021. (ajn)
February 18, 2021 Filing 1 **DEFICIENT** PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) filed by Jeffrey Michael Reynolds. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v. Louisiana State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Michael Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?