Cox v. Louisiana State et al
Plaintiff: Albert Cox
Defendant: Darrell Vannoy, Louisiana State and N. Burl Cain
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Case Number: 2:2021cv00375
Filed: February 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: that, on or before 4/29/2021, petitioner Albert Cox shall SHOW CAUSE in writing why this case should not be dismissed with prejudice for failure to pay the $5.00 filing fee or submit a completed pauper application and for failure to inform the Court of his current address as required by L.R. 11.1 and L.R. 41.3.1. Payment of the $5.00 filing fee or submission of a properly completed pauper application by this deadline will satisfy the Courts Show Cause Order. FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER WILL RESULT IN A RECOMMENDATION THAT THIS CASE BE DISMISSED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 3/30/2021.(caa)
February 23, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe DOCUMENT: re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254). Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 3/16/2021. (jls)
February 18, 2021 Filing 1 **DEFICIENT** PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) filed by Albert Cox. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jls)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Louisiana State et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Vannoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?