Fontenelle v. Narcisse et al
Plaintiff: Eric Fontenelle
Defendant: Denise Narcisse
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Case Number: 2:2021cv00388
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2021 Filing 5 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) by Denise Narcisse.Attorney Darren Anthony Allemand added to party Denise Narcisse(pty:dft).(Allemand, Darren)
March 4, 2021 Filing 4 Return of Service of Habeas Corpus served on Jefferson Parish Clerk's Office on 3/1/21(cg)
March 3, 2021 Filing 3 Return of Service of Habeas Corpus served on Jefferson Parish D.A.'s Office on 3/1/21(cg)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Habeas Corpus Response Order that Attorney General for the State of Louisiana and the District Attorney for Jefferson Parish respond to the petition of Habeas Corpus within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 2/25/2021.(sa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/26/2021: #1 Return Receipts for Mailing of HC Response Order) (sa).
February 22, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (Filing fee $ 5) filed by Eric Fontenelle. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(cg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fontenelle v. Narcisse et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Narcisse
Represented By: Darren Anthony Allemand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Fontenelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?