Padgett v. BruMar Mechanical Contractors, LLC
Plaintiff: Shea Padgett
Defendant: BruMar Mechanical Contractors, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00408
Filed: February 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Second Motion for Extension of Time to Plead re #1 Complaint as to BruMar Mechanical Contractors, LLC; answer due 4/30/2021. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 4/15/2021. (mm)
April 14, 2021 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead by BruMar Mechanical Contractors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schoen, Hunter) Modified text on 4/14/2021 (am).
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 3/29/2021. (NEF: Judge Douglas)(ajn)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint as to BruMar Mechanical Contractors, LLC answer due 4/16/2021. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 3/26/2021. (am)
March 26, 2021 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by BruMar Mechanical Contractors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schoen, Hunter)
March 26, 2021 Filing 6 **DEFICIENT**EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by BruMar Mechanical Contractors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Hunter Jacob Schoen added to party BruMar Mechanical Contractors, LLC(pty:dft).(Schoen, Hunter) Modified text on 3/26/2021 (am).
March 5, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; BruMar Mechanical Contractors, LLC served on 3/4/2021, answer due 3/25/2021. (Stiegler, Charles) Modified text on 3/5/2021 (am).
March 4, 2021 Filing 4 **DEFICIENT**SUMMONS Returned Executed; BruMar Mechanical Contractors, LLC served on 3/4/2021, answer due 3/25/2021. (Stiegler, Charles) Modified text on 3/4/2021 (am).
February 25, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BruMar Mechanical Contractors, LLC. (lt)
February 25, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (go)
February 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against BruMar Mechanical Contractors, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BLAEDC-8750155) filed by Shea Padgett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Charles J. Stiegler added to party Shea Padgett(pty:pla).(Stiegler, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padgett v. BruMar Mechanical Contractors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BruMar Mechanical Contractors, LLC
Represented By: Lauren Lopresto Tafaro
Represented By: Hunter Jacob Schoen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shea Padgett
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?