Langley v. Tanner et al
Plaintiff: Steven Langley
Defendant: Sgt King, John Craina, Department of Public Safety & Corrections State of Louisiana, Robert Goings, Robert Turner, Captain Hillman and Robert Tanner
Case Number: 2:2021cv00421
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Susie Morgan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff Steven Langley SHOW CAUSE in writing on or before May 10, 2021, why his complaint should not be dismissed for his failure to pay the filing fee or to submit a certified pauper application. Payment of the filing fee or submission of a properly completed and certified pauper application by this deadline will satisfy the Court's Order. Failure to comply with this Order will result in a recommendation that Plaintiff's Complaint be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 4/19/2021.(sa)
March 3, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 3/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Original Pleading, #2 1983 Form, #3 Application to Proceed IFP) (sbs)
February 26, 2021 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:20-cv-00786. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (jls)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Transferring Case to the Eastern District of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 2/26/2021. (ELW) [Transferred from lamd on 2/26/2021.]
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Vacating #2 Order Transferring Case to Another District. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 2/26/2021. (ELW) [Transferred from lamd on 2/26/2021.]
February 24, 2021 Filing 4 Extraction Log of a case Transferred to Western District of Louisiana. (LLH) [Transferred from lamd on 2/26/2021.]
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (LLH) [Transferred from lamd on 2/26/2021.]
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Transferring Case to the Western District of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 2/24/2021. (LLH) [Transferred from lamd on 2/26/2021.]
November 18, 2020 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 2/26/2021.]
November 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Craina, Robert Goings, Unknown Hillman, State of Louisiana Departmet of Public Safety and Corrections, Robert Turner, Unknown Virds, filed by Steven Langley.(KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 2/26/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langley v. Tanner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Craina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Public Safety & Corrections State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Goings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Hillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?