Kenner City v. Netflix, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: City of Kenner and Kenner City
Defendant: Hulu, LLC and Netflix, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00445
Filed: March 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #48 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Defendants, Hulu, LLC and Netflix, Inc., are hereby granted until 10/07/2021 to file responsive pleadings in this case, including but not limited to Rule 12 motions, if any. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 08/18/2021. (ko)
August 18, 2021 Filing 50 Supplemental Memorandum filed by Kenner City, in Support of #21 MOTION to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(ko)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 08/18/2021. (ko)
August 17, 2021 Filing 48 EXPARTE/CONSENT Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal by Hulu, LLC., Kenner City, Netflix, Inc. (Landrieu, Martin) Modified text/filers on 8/18/2021 (bw).
August 17, 2021 Filing 47 Response/Reply by All Defendants to #46 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority (Landrieu, Martin)
August 12, 2021 Filing 46 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority re: rec. doc. 21 by Kenner City. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Pleading-Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Meyer, Daniel)
July 29, 2021 Filing 45 Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Kenner City, in Support of #21 MOTION to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(ko)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 07/29/2021. (ko)
July 27, 2021 Filing 43 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority re: rec. doc. 21 by Kenner City. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Proposed Pleading-Exhibit Supplemental Authority)(Meyer, Daniel)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, as to Hulu, LLC, Netflix, Inc. answer due 9/7/2021. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 06/28/2021. (ko)
June 23, 2021 Filing 41 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #40 THIRD MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings re #1 Notice of Removal. **Filing attorney should have linked filing to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm)
June 23, 2021 Filing 40 EXPARTE/CONSENT THIRD MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings re #1 Notice of Removal by All Parties. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Landrieu, Martin) Modified text/added linkage on 6/23/2021 (mm).
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #37 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Victor Jih. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 05/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (ko)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #36 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ryan Benyamin. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 05/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (ko)
May 17, 2021 Filing 37 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Victor H. Jih (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8861473) by Hulu, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Landrieu, Martin)
May 17, 2021 Filing 36 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ryan S. Benyamin (Fee previously paid) by Hulu, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Landrieu, Martin)
May 14, 2021 Filing 35 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Victor H. Jih and Ryan S. Benyamin (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8859420) by Hulu, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Landrieu, Martin) Modified text on 5/14/2021 (mm).
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, as to Hulu, LLC, Netflix, Inc. answer due 7/9/2021. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 05/04/2021. (ko)
May 3, 2021 Filing 33 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #32 JOINT MOTION for Second Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. **1. Filing attorney did not enter additional filer(s) in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filer(s). 2. Name of attorney who electronically filed this document does not match name of signatory attorney on pleading. The user log-in and password serve as the required signature for purposes of Rule 11 of the FRCP. No further action is necessary. 3. Attachment had duplicate description. For attachments, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
May 3, 2021 Filing 32 EXPARTE/CONSENT JOINT MOTION for Second Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by All Parties. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zeno, Micah) Modified text/filers on 5/3/2021 (mm).
April 28, 2021 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Kenner City re #21 MOTION to Remand. (mm)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #28 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum re: rec. doc. 21 by Kenner City. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 4/28/2021. (tjg)
April 28, 2021 Filing 29 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #28 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. **Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent Motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte' and removed submission date.** (mm)
April 27, 2021 Filing 28 EXPARTE/CONSENT UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum re: rec. doc. 21 by Kenner City. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Order)(Meyer, Daniel) Modified text/removed submission date on 4/28/2021 (mm).
April 22, 2021 Filing 27 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #21 MOTION to Remand. (Landrieu, Martin)
April 20, 2021 Filing 26 DEFICIENT: RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #21 MOTION to Remand. (Landrieu, Martin) Modified text on 4/21/2021 (mm).
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Leave to File Corrected Memorandum. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 04/06/2021. (ko)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Elkin Kistner. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 04/06/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (ko)
April 2, 2021 Filing 23 EXPARTE/CONSENT UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Memorandum re: rec. doc. 21-1 by Kenner City. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Order)(Meyer, Daniel) Modified text on 4/2/2021 (mm).
April 2, 2021 Filing 22 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #21 MOTION to Remand. **Name of attorney who electronically filed this document does not match name of signatory attorney on pleading. The user log-in and password serve as the required signature for purposes of Rule 11 of the FRCP. No further action is necessary.** (mm)
April 1, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Remand by Kenner City. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Meyer, Daniel) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/6/2021 per Order at Rec. Doc. 25) (ko).
March 23, 2021 Filing 19 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Elkin Kistner (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8787525) by Kenner City. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B-Declaration, #3 Exhibit C-Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Burnett, Malvern) Modified text on 3/24/2021 (mm).
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Mary Rose Alexander. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 03/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (ko)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert C. Collins, III, as counsel for Netflix, Inc. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 3/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (sa)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jean A. Pawlow. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 03/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (ko)
March 19, 2021 Filing 15 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 , #12 , #13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Consent of Electronic Filing form. The pdf should have been flattened. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click PRINT to adobe pdf to flatten the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (lt)
March 18, 2021 Filing 14 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Netflix, Inc. (Thibodeaux, Brandie)
March 18, 2021 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Mary Rose Alexander (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8781596) by Netflix, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Mary R. Alexander, #3 Exhibit C - Consent of Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Thibodeaux, Brandie) (Attachment 3 replaced on 3/19/2021) (lt). Modified text on 3/19/2021 (lt).
March 18, 2021 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jean A. Pawlow (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8781577) by Netflix, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Jean A. Pawlow, #3 Exhibit C - Consent of Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Thibodeaux, Brandie) (Attachment 3 replaced on 3/19/2021) (lt). Modified text on 3/19/2021 (lt).
March 18, 2021 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert C. Collins, III (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8781527) by Netflix, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Robert Collins, #3 Exhibit C - Consent of Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Thibodeaux, Brandie) (Attachment 3 replaced on 3/19/2021) (lt). Modified text on 3/19/2021 (lt).
March 18, 2021 Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #9 Notice of Compliance. **Filing attorney should have linked filing to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm)
March 17, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Compliance by Hulu, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal. (Antis, Phillip) Modified linkage on 3/18/2021 (mm).
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Defendants, Hulu, LLC and Netflix, Inc. are hereby granted a 60 day extension of time, until May 10, 2021, to file responsive pleadings in this case, including but not limited to Rule 12 motions, if any. Plaintiff, City of Kenner, for good cause shown, is hereby granted a 180-day extension of time, until and including December 1, 2021, to file its motion for class certification. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 03/12/2021. (ko)
March 11, 2021 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Notice of Removal, JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to Certify a Class. **Document lists counsel of record, Elvin L. Kistner, for a party in this action who has not been admitted to practice in this court. Any party not appearing in proper person must be represented by a member of the bar of this court (L.R. 83.2.4). Please see Local Rule 83.2.2 for this court's Procedures for Admission. Any party not appearing in proper person must be represented by a member of the bar of this court (L.R. 83.2.4). Please see Local Rule 83.2.2 for this courts Procedures for Admission.** (mm)
March 10, 2021 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Notice of Removal, JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to Certify a Class by Hulu, LLC, Netflix, Inc., Kenner City. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Landrieu, Martin) Modified text on 3/11/2021 (mm).
March 4, 2021 Filing 5 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Hulu, LLC. By the Clerk. (bm)
March 4, 2021 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. Exhibits on incorrect sized paper. Local Rule 10.1E states 'All papers drafted for filing in this court shall be on 8-1/2 by 11 inch paper. Clerk has reduced images. No further action needed. (bm)
March 3, 2021 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Hulu, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Walt Disney Company, Corporate Parent Comcast Corporation for Hulu, LLC (Antis, Phillip)
March 3, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (aj)
March 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th JDC for the Parish of Jefferson, case number 814168 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8761407) filed by Hulu, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record and Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Netflix Joinder and Consent, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Phillip J. Antis, Jr added to party Hulu, LLC(pty:dft).(Antis, Phillip) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/4/2021) (bm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kenner City v. Netflix, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Kenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenner City
Represented By: Elkin Kistner
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Malvern Clopton Burnett
Represented By: Joshua C. Joseph
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hulu, LLC
Represented By: Phillip J. Antis, Jr.
Represented By: Martin E. Landrieu
Represented By: Micah Collins Zeno
Represented By: Ryan Benyamin
Represented By: Victor Jih
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netflix, Inc.
Represented By: Brandie Mendoza Thibodeaux
Represented By: Glenn Lyle Maximilian Swetman
Represented By: Mary A. Reed
Represented By: Mary Rose Alexander
Represented By: Robert C. Collins, III
Represented By: Jean A. Pawlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?