Overstreet v. Miller
Plaintiff: Rickey Overstreet
Defendant: Patricia Miller
Case Number: 2:2021cv00583
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply until 6/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 5/19/2021. (ajn)
May 17, 2021 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Patricia Miller. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Clauss, Matthew)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Court grants the respondent an extension of twenty-one days, until 5/17/2021, in which to file a response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 4/27/2021. (ajn)
April 26, 2021 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Patricia Miller. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Matthew R. Clauss added to party Patricia Miller(pty:dft).(Clauss, Matthew)
April 2, 2021 Filing 5 Return of Service of Habeas Corpus Response Order served on Attorney General's Office on 3/29/2021(am)
April 1, 2021 Filing 4 Return of Service of H.C. Response Order served on Clerk of Court, Jefferson Parish on 3/30/2021(ajn)
March 31, 2021 Filing 3 Return of Service of Habeas Corpus Response Order served on District Attorney, Jefferson Parish on 3/29/2021(am)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Habeas Corpus Response Order that Attorney General for the State of Louisiana and the District Attorney and Clerk of Court for Jefferson Parish Parish respond to the petition of Habeas Corpus within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 3/25/2021.(ajn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/26/2021: #1 Certified Mail Receipts) (ajn).
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (Filing fee $ 5) filed by Rickey Overstreet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Overstreet v. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Clauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rickey Overstreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?