Venture Global Gator Express, LLC v. Land, et al.
Plaintiff: Venture Global Gator Express, LLC
Defendant: Johnny's Oyscers No. 3, Inc. and Land
Case Number: 2:2021cv00644
Filed: March 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0717
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing. A call-in scheduling Conference is set for 6/24/2021 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. Please follow the call-in instructions provided in the notice.(mmv)
May 20, 2021 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 Answer to Complaint. Document contains incorrect Section Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section D.(lt)
May 19, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Johnny's Oyscers No. 3, Inc. Attorney Corey E. Dunbar added to party Johnny's Oyscers No. 3, Inc.(pty:dft).(Dunbar, Corey) Modified text on 5/20/2021 (lt).
April 7, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Johnny's Oyscers No. 3, Inc. on 3/31/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (Charpentier, Troy)
March 31, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Venture Global Gator Express, LLC. (Charpentier, Troy)
March 31, 2021 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Filing attorney attached a NOTICE to this Complaint instead of filing it as a separate entry. Clerk took corrective action by separating the Notice and docketing it as a separate entry. Please follow this requirement on future pleadings.** (jeg)
March 31, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF CONDEMNATION ACTION by Venture Global Gator Express, LLC. (jeg)(1cc: Plaintiff)
March 31, 2021 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Filing attorney erroneously attached the Civil Cover Sheet as the main document instead of an attachment. Clerk took corrective action and replaced the images of the main document with the image of the Complaint (attachment 1), and attached the Civil Cover Sheet as attachment. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
March 31, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (aj)
March 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Land and Johnny's Oyscers No. 3, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8796327) filed by Venture Global Gator Express, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action)Attorney Troy J. Charpentier added to party Venture Global Gator Express, LLC(pty:pla).(Charpentier, Troy) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/31/2021) (jeg). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/31/2021) (jeg). Modified text/order of documents on 3/31/2021 (jeg). (1cc: Plaintiff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Venture Global Gator Express, LLC v. Land, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny's Oyscers No. 3, Inc.
Represented By: George Pivach, II
Represented By: Ellen Pivach Dunbar
Represented By: Corey E. Dunbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venture Global Gator Express, LLC
Represented By: Troy J. Charpentier
Represented By: Katilyn M Hollowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?