Meadows v. Vannoy et al
Plaintiff: Billy Meadows and Billy Ray Meadows
Defendant: Darrel Vannoy
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Case Number: 2:2021cv00741
Filed: April 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Susie Morgan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The party has sufficient funds to pay the filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 4/27/21. (cg)
April 23, 2021 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Billy Ray Meadows. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Original IFP)(bm)
April 23, 2021 Filing 4 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) filed by Billy Ray Meadows. (Attachments: #1 Original Petition, #2 Original Memo in Support, #3 Original Exhibit A, #4 Transmittal Letter, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(bm)
April 13, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254). Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 5/4/2021. (pp)
April 9, 2021 Filing 2 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Billy Meadows. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. (pp)
April 9, 2021 Filing 1 **DEFICIENT** PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) filed by Billy Meadows. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, (4) Civil Cover Sheet)(pp) Modified on 4/13/2021 (bwn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meadows v. Vannoy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Ray Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrel Vannoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?