Edwards v. Capital City Press, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dow Edwards, Alfred Doucette and Dow Michael Edwards
Defendant: Second Street Media, LLC, Capital City Press, LLC doing business as New Orleans Advocate, My Capture, LLC, Chris Granger and Capital City Press, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00799
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Second Street Media, LLC on 6/11/2021, answer due 8/10/2021. (Harris, Lesli) Modified service date on 6/16/2021 (lt).
June 15, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to My Capture, LLC on 6/11/2021, answer due 8/10/2021. (Harris, Lesli) Modified service date on 6/16/2021 (lt).
June 15, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Chris Granger on 6/11/2021, answer due 8/10/2021. (Harris, Lesli) Modified service date on 6/16/2021 (lt).
June 15, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Capital City Press, LLC on 6/11/2021, answer due 8/10/2021. (Harris, Lesli) Modified service date on 6/16/2021 (lt).
June 11, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Dow Michael Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Harris, Lesli) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/14/2021: #2 AOform121 (Amended)) (bm).
June 3, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Chris Granger on 4/20/2021, answer due 6/21/2021. (Harris, Lesli) Modified text/date on 6/3/2021 (lt).
May 27, 2021 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Waiver of Service Executed. Filing attorney entered incorrect date for the date waiver sent to party; waiver sent to on 4/20/2021, answer due 6/21/2021. No further action is necessary. (lt)
May 26, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to My Capture, LLC on 4/20/2021, answer due 6/21/2021; Second Street Media, LLC on 4/20/2021, answer due 6/21/2021. (Harris, Lesli) Modified text on 5/27/2021 (lt).
May 11, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Capital City Press, LLC on 4/30/2021, answer due 6/29/2021. (Harris, Lesli)
April 28, 2021 Filing 3 **DEFICIENT** WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Capital City Press, LLC on 4/22/2021, answer due 6/21/2021. (Harris, Lesli) Modified on 4/29/2021 (jls).
April 20, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (aj)
April 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Capital City Press, LLC, Chris Granger, My Capture, LLC, Second Street Media, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8824960) filed by Dow Michael Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Lesli D. Harris added to party Dow Michael Edwards(pty:pla).(Harris, Lesli) Modified filer/text on 4/21/2021 (lt). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/21/2021: #3 AO 121) (lt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Capital City Press, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Second Street Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital City Press, LLC doing business as New Orleans Advocate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: My Capture, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Granger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital City Press, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dow Edwards
Represented By: Lesli D. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Doucette
Represented By: Loulan Joseph Pitre, Jr.
Represented By: Lesli Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dow Michael Edwards
Represented By: Loulan Joseph Pitre, Jr.
Represented By: Lesli Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?