Tijerino v. Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund
Plaintiff: Manuel Tijerino
Defendant: Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund
Case Number: 2:2021cv00907
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund on 5/19/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. (Miller, Gregory)
May 7, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund. (am)
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Miller, Gregory)
May 6, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
May 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8849531) filed by Manuel Tijerino. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Gregory John Miller added to party Manuel Tijerino(pty:pla).(Miller, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tijerino v. Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Tijerino
Represented By: Gregory John Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?