Rushing v. Vannoy et al
Plaintiff: David Rushing
Defendant: Darrel Vannoy
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Case Number: 2:2021cv00929
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TRANSFER ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that David Rushing's 2254 petition is construed in part as a motion for authorization for the District Court to consider the second or successive claims raised therein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the petition be and hereby is TRANSFERRED to the United States Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals under the authority of 28 U.S.C. 1631 for that Court to determine whether petitioner is authorized under 28 U.S.C. 2244(b) to file the instant habeas corpus petition in this District Court. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/10/2021.(mm)
June 4, 2021 Filing fee paid re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (Filing fee $ 5) (mm)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DENYING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 5/12/2021. (jeg)
May 10, 2021 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Rushing. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (mm)
May 10, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) filed by David Rushing. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Exhibits 1-18)(mm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rushing v. Vannoy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Rushing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrel Vannoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?