Shallow Water Equipment L.L.C. et al v. Pontchartrain Partners, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: TK Boat Rentals, L.L.C. and Shallow Water Equipment, L.L.C.
Defendant: Pontchartrain Partners, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00949
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2021 Filing 11 PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE: A PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE will be held BY TELEPHONE on TUESDAY, AUGUST 10, 2021, at 10:30AM, for the purpose of scheduling a pre-trial conference and trial on the merits and for a discussion of the status and discovery cut-off dates. Please use the following information to call in for the conference: Dial: 888-557-8511/Access code: 6655019. By Clerk.(cwa)
July 8, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Pontchartrain Partners, LLC.(McDonald, Jeffrey)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Brett M. Bollinger, Randell E. Treadaway, Jeffrey E. McDonald, Brad D. Ferrand, Jeremy Hite Call for Pontchartrain Partners, LLC. Attorney Jason R. Anders terminated. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/21/2021. (cwa)
June 21, 2021 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Jeffrey E. McDonald to be substituted in place of Jason R. Anders by Pontchartrain Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Anders, Jason)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Pontchartrain Partners, LLC answer due 6/28/2021. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/7/2021. (cwa)
June 4, 2021 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Pontchartrain Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Jason R. Anders added to party Pontchartrain Partners, LLC(pty:dft).(Anders, Jason)
May 18, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Pontchartrain Partners, LLC served on 5/17/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Morse, Harry)
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Pontchartrain Partners, L.L.C. (lt)
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (go)
May 14, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Morse, Harry)
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pontchartrain Partners, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8859650) filed by TK Boat Rentals, L.L.C., Shallow Water Equipment, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)Attorney Harry E. Morse added to party Shallow Water Equipment, L.L.C.(pty:pla), Attorney Harry E. Morse added to party TK Boat Rentals, L.L.C.(pty:pla).(Morse, Harry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shallow Water Equipment L.L.C. et al v. Pontchartrain Partners, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TK Boat Rentals, L.L.C.
Represented By: Martin S. Bohman
Represented By: Harry E. Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shallow Water Equipment, L.L.C.
Represented By: Martin S. Bohman
Represented By: Harry E. Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pontchartrain Partners, LLC
Represented By: Brett M. Bollinger
Represented By: Jason R. Anders
Represented By: Brad D. Ferrand
Represented By: Jeffrey E. McDonald
Represented By: Jeremy Hite Call
Represented By: Randell E. Treadaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?