In Re: Falcon Global Offshore II LLC et al
Petitioner: Seacor Liftboats, LLC, Seacor Marine LLC and Falcon Global Offshore II LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Lawrence James Warren, II
Claimant: Hannah Daspit, James Gracien, Bryan Mires, Krista Vercher, Yvette J. Ledet, Dwayne Lewis, Janet Hartford, Antranae Hartford, Shelia Wallingsford, Verley Williams, Bryson Williams, June Bergeron Rozands, Charlton Peter Rozands, Jr, Rathey Encalade, Brandy Norris, Lynn Shields Warren and Charles Scallan, Jr.
3Rd Party Defendant: Semco LLC, Talos Energy LLC, Donjon Marine Co Inc and Donjon-Smit, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01062
Filed: June 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
2 Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
3 Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 30504
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2021 Filing 65 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #64 Answer to Complaint. 1. Document on incorrect sized paper. Local Rule 10.1E states 'All papers drafted for filing in this court shall be on 8-1/2 by 11 inch paper. Clerk has reduced images. No further action needed. 2. Document does not contain Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Magistrate Janis van Meerveld (1). (bw)
July 29, 2021 Filing 64 ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Charles Scallan, Jr.Attorney David C. Laborde added to party Charles Scallan, Jr(pty:pla).(Laborde, David) (Main Document 64 replaced on 7/30/2021) (bw).
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #62 Motion to Shorten Monition Period,. The Order directing issuance of Notice to Claimants is hereby modified shortening the monition period from 10/4/2021 to 09/01/2021, requiring all relevant claims to be filed on or before 09/01/2021, absent a showing of good cause. FURTHER ORDERED that Limitation Plaintiffs shall email a copy of this Order to counsel for any potential claimant who has not yet appeared in this limitation action. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 07/23/2021. (ko)
July 22, 2021 Filing 62 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Shorten Monition Period by Falcon Global Offshore II LLC, Seacor Liftboats, LLC, Seacor Marine LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tompkins, Peter) Modified text on 7/22/2021 (am).
July 22, 2021 Filing 61 NOTICE and Proof of Publications by Falcon Global Offshore II LLC, Seacor Liftboats, LLC, Seacor Marine LLC re #5 Order, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A,B & C)(Tompkins, Peter) Modified text on 7/22/2021 (am).
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #59 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #21 Answer to Complaint, as to Donjon Marine Co Inc(Rec. Doc. 21) answer due 8/11/2021.. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 07/22/2021. (am)
July 21, 2021 Filing 59 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #21 Third Party Complaint, of Shelia Wallingsford by Donjon Marine Co Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harowski, Michael) Modified text on 7/21/2021 (am).
July 20, 2021 Filing 58 ANSWER to #21 Third Party Complaint of Shelia Wallingsford by Talos Energy LLC.(Diaz, Thomas) Modified text/linkage on 7/21/2021 (am).
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: GRANTING #56 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #29 Answer to Third Party Complaint, as to Donjon Marine Co Inc, answer due 8/6/2021. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 07/19/2021. (am)
July 16, 2021 Filing 56 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #29 Answer to Complaint, /Plead in Response to Third-Party Complaint by Donjon Marine Co Inc(Rec. Doc. 29). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Michael A Harowski added to party Donjon Marine Co Inc(pty:3pd).(Harowski, Michael)
July 16, 2021 Filing 55 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #54 Answer to Complaint. Document does not contain Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Magistrate Janis van Meerveld (1). (lw)
July 15, 2021 Filing 54 ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Lynn Shields Warren. Attorney James E. Shields, Jr added to party Lynn Shields Warren(pty:clm), Attorney James E. Shields, Jr added to party Lynn Shields Warren(pty:3pp).(Shields, James)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #29 Third Party Complaint, as to Talos Energy LLC(Rec. Doc. 29) answer due 8/9/2021. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 07/09/2021. (ko)
July 8, 2021 Filing 52 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo: Status Conference held on 7/8/2021. IT IS ORDERED that the status conference previously set for July 15, 2021 is CONTINUED and RESET for September 8, 2021 at 2:30p.m. (am)
July 8, 2021 Filing 51 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #29 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint by Talos Energy LLC(Rec. Doc. 29). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bercaw, James)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 AGREED INITIAL VESSEL INSPECTION PROTOCOL ORDER: Parties to comply as stated herein. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 7/8/2021. (cwa)
July 8, 2021 Filing 49 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Donjon Marine Co Inc(Rec. Doc. 29) served on 6/25/2021, answer due 7/21/2021. (Palazzo, Leo)
July 7, 2021 Filing 48 **DEFICIENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed; Donjon Marine Co Inc(Rec. Doc. 29) served on 6/24/2021, answer due 7/21/2021. (Palazzo, Leo) Modified on 7/8/2021 (cwa).
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #44 MOTION to Continue Submission Date on Motion for Threshold Proof of Standing to Seek Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability. The submission date on #25 MOTION Threshold Proof of Standing to Seek Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability is continued to 8/11/2021. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 07/06/2021.(ko)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #43 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #29 Answer to Complaint, as to Talos Energy LLC answer due 9/20/2021. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 07/06/2021. (ko)
July 2, 2021 Filing 45 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION for Entry of Initial Vessel Inspection Protocol Order by Falcon Global Offshore II LLC, Seacor Liftboats, LLC, Seacor Marine LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hemphill, Gary)
July 2, 2021 Filing 44 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date on Motion for Threshold Proof of Standing to Seek Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability by Falcon Global Offshore II LLC, Seacor Liftboats, LLC, Seacor Marine LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kraatz, Arthur)
July 2, 2021 Filing 43 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer /Plead in Response to Third-Party Complaint by Talos Energy LLC(Rec. Doc. #29 ). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jurgens, George) Modified text/link on 7/6/2021 (bw).
July 2, 2021 Filing 42 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Donjon Marine Co Inc(Rec. Doc. 29) served on 6/30/2021, answer due 7/21/2021. (Discon, Thomas)
July 2, 2021 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Donjon-Smit, LLC (Rec. Doc. 21) served on 6/29/2021, answer due 7/20/2021. (Discon, Thomas)
July 2, 2021 Filing 40 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Talos Energy LLC(Rec. Doc. 29) served on 6/29/2021, answer due 7/20/2021. (Discon, Thomas) Modified text on 7/6/2021 (bw).
July 2, 2021 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Talos Energy LLC(Rec. Doc. 28) served on 6/28/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. (Palazzo, Leo) Modified text on 7/6/2021 (bw).
July 2, 2021 Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Donjon-Smit, LLC (Rec. Doc. 21) served on 6/28/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. (Palazzo, Leo)
June 30, 2021 Filing 37 ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint,, by Brandy Norris.Attorney Glenn Lieberman added to party Brandy Norris(pty:clm).(Lieberman, Glenn)
June 30, 2021 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Semco LLC on 6/30/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (Downer, Huntington)
June 30, 2021 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Talos Energy LLC(Rec. Doc. 29) on 6/30/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (Downer, Huntington)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that a status conference with all counsel is SET for July 15, 2021 at 3:00p.m. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 06/24/2021.(am)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re #24 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. IT IS ORDERED that Paul Sterbcow and Hugh Lambert are appointed as Co-Lead Liaison Counsel in this matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Kristi Post, Ian Taylor, Blake David, Richard Martin, and Hunt Downer are appointed to the Executive Committee in this matter. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 06/24/2021.(am)
June 23, 2021 Filing 32 Summons Issued as to Donjon Marine Co Inc, Donjon-Smit, LLC , Talos Energy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(am)
June 23, 2021 Filing 31 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #29 Answer to Complaint. **Document lists counsel Davin R. Savoy, for a party in this action who has not been admitted to practice in this court. Please see Local Rule 83.2.2 for this courts Procedures for Admission. Any future filings which list attorneys not admitted will not be accepted and will be deemed deficient.** (am)
June 23, 2021 Filing 30 Summons Issued as to Falcon Global Offshore II LLC, Seacor Liftboats, LLC, Seacor Marine LLC, Semco, LLC, Talos Energy LLC(Rec. Doc. 21). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(am)
June 23, 2021 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, CLAIM and, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Donjon Marine Co Inc, Donjon-Smit, LLC, Talos Energy LLC by Rathey Encalade. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to DonJon-Smit, #2 Summons Summons to DonJon Marine, #3 Summons Summons to Talos)Attorney Leo J Palazzo added to party Rathey Encalade(pty:clm).(Palazzo, Leo) Modified text on 6/23/2021 (am).
June 22, 2021 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, CLAIM and, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Talos Energy LLC, Semco, LLC, Seacor Liftboats, LLC, Seacor Marine LLC, Falcon Global Offshore II LLC by June Bergeron Rozands, Charlton Peter Rozands, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Summons directed to Talos Energy, LLC, #2 Summons directed to Semco, LLC)Attorney Huntington B. Downer, Jr added to party Charlton Peter Rozands, Jr(pty:clm), Attorney Huntington B. Downer, Jr added to party Charlton Peter Rozands, Jr(pty:3pp), Attorney Huntington B. Downer, Jr added to party June Bergeron Rozands(pty:clm), Attorney Huntington B. Downer, Jr added to party June Bergeron Rozands(pty:3pp).(Downer, Huntington) Modified text on 6/23/2021 (am).
June 22, 2021 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Talos Energy LLC(Rec. Doc. 21) on 6/22/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (Post, Kristi)
June 21, 2021 Filing 26 ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint,, by Verley Williams, Bryson Williams.Attorney Jerome H. Moroux added to party Verley Williams(pty:clm), Attorney Jerome H. Moroux added to party Bryson Williams(pty:clm).(Moroux, Jerome)
June 18, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION Threshold Proof of Standing to Seek Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability by Dwayne Lewis. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission)(Martin, Richard)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Establish and Appoint Limitation Claimants' Leadership Structure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that applications/nominations for the positions of Co-Lead Liaison Counsel and Executive Committee member be mailed or faxed to Chambers on or before 6/23/2021 as set forth in document.Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 6/17/2021. (my)
June 18, 2021 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to Donjon Marine Co Inc, Donjon-Smit, LLC, Talos Energy LLC(Rec. Doc. 16). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(bw)
June 17, 2021 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Shelia Wallingsford re #13 MOTION To Establish And Appoint Limitation Claimants' Leadership Structure . (Discon, Thomas)
June 17, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand and Third-Party Complaint by Shelia Wallingsford. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney Thomas Massa Discon added to party Shelia Wallingsford(pty:clm).(Discon, Thomas)
June 17, 2021 Filing 20 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #16 Answer to Complaint. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of summons. The pdf should not have the green header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Filing attorney submitted incorrect form the correct form is third party summons. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (am)
June 17, 2021 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Talos Energy LLC. (am) (Main Document 19 replaced on 6/17/2021) (am).
June 16, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Support filed by Hartford Antranae, Hartford Janet re #13 MOTION To Establish And Appoint Limitation Claimants' Leadership Structure . (Post, Kristi)
June 16, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Support filed by Dwayne Lewis re #13 MOTION To Establish And Appoint Limitation Claimants' Leadership Structure . (Martin, Richard)
June 16, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint, and Third Party Demand by Hartford Janet, Hartford Antranae. (Attachments: #1 Summons)Attorney Kristi Ann Post added to party Hartford Janet(pty:clm), Attorney Kristi Ann Post added to party Hartford Antranae(pty:clm).(Post, Kristi) Modified text on 6/17/2021 (am). (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/17/2021) (am).
June 16, 2021 Filing 15 First Amended ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint, in Limitation by Dwayne Lewis.(Martin, Richard) Modified text on 6/17/2021 (am).
June 16, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint, in Limitation by Dwayne Lewis.Attorney Richard Massie Martin, Jr added to party Dwayne Lewis(pty:clm).(Martin, Richard) Modified text on 6/16/2021 (am).
June 15, 2021 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION To Establish And Appoint Limitation Claimants' Leadership Structure by Hannah Daspit, James Gracien, Yvette J. Ledet, Bryan Mires, Krista Vercher. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Sterbcow, Paul)
June 14, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint in Limitation by Yvette J. Ledet. Attorney Hugh Palmer Lambert added to party Yvette J. Ledet(pty:clm).(Lambert, Hugh).
June 11, 2021 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #9 Answer to Complaint, #7 Answer to Complaint, #8 Answer to Complaint, #10 Answer to Complaint. **Document does not contain Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Sectionand MagistrateJanis van Meerveld.** (am)
June 11, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint,, in Limitation by Krista Vercher.Attorney Paul M. Sterbcow added to party Krista Vercher(pty:clm).(Sterbcow, Paul)
June 11, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint,, in Limitation by Bryan Mires.Attorney Paul M. Sterbcow added to party Bryan Mires(pty:clm).(Sterbcow, Paul)
June 11, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint,, in Limitation by James Gracien.Attorney Paul M. Sterbcow added to party James Gracien(pty:clm).(Sterbcow, Paul)
June 11, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint,, in Limitation by Hannah Daspit.Attorney Paul M. Sterbcow added to party Hannah Daspit(pty:clm).(Sterbcow, Paul)
June 9, 2021 Filing 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo: Status Conference held on 6/9/2021 to discuss the status of the case. (am)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER APPROVING PETITIONER'S LETTER OF UNDERTAKING, DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE AND RESTRAINING PROSECUTION OF CLAIMS re #1 Complaint,, filed by Seacor Marine LLC, Falcon Global Offshore II LLC. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 06/04/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(am)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. Judge Barry W Ashe, Magistrate Judge Michael North no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 06/03/2021.(NEF to Case Managers)(am)
June 2, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (go)
June 2, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE to Claimants by Falcon Global Offshore II LLC, Seacor Liftboats LLC, Seacor Marine LLC . (Tompkins, Peter) Modified text on 6/2/2021 (am).
June 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8884315) filed by Falcon Global Offshore II LLC, Seacor Liftboats LLC, Seacor Marine LLC. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Exhibit "A" Valuation, #3 Exhibit "B" Letter of Undertaking, #4 Local Rule 3.1 Notice, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Peter B. Tompkins added to party Falcon Global Offshore II LLC(pty:pet), Attorney Peter B. Tompkins added to party SEACOR Liftboats LLC(pty:pet), Attorney Peter B. Tompkins added to party Seacor Marine LLC(pty:pet).(Tompkins, Peter) Modified text on 6/2/2021 (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Falcon Global Offshore II LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Seacor Liftboats, LLC
Represented By: Timothy David DePaula
Represented By: Arthur Raymond Kraatz
Represented By: Peter Brooks Sloss
Represented By: Peter B. Tompkins
Represented By: Adam N. Davis
Represented By: Tarryn Elizabeth Walsh
Represented By: Gary Alan Hemphill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Seacor Marine LLC
Represented By: Timothy David DePaula
Represented By: Arthur Raymond Kraatz
Represented By: Peter Brooks Sloss
Represented By: Peter B. Tompkins
Represented By: Adam N. Davis
Represented By: Tarryn Elizabeth Walsh
Represented By: Gary Alan Hemphill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Falcon Global Offshore II LLC
Represented By: Timothy David DePaula
Represented By: Arthur Raymond Kraatz
Represented By: Peter Brooks Sloss
Represented By: Peter B. Tompkins
Represented By: Adam N. Davis
Represented By: Tarryn Elizabeth Walsh
Represented By: Gary Alan Hemphill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Lawrence James Warren, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Hannah Daspit
Represented By: Paul M. Sterbcow
Represented By: Beth Elster Abramson
Represented By: Conrad S. P. Williams, III
Represented By: David Alan Abramson
Represented By: Ian F. Taylor
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Ibert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: James Gracien
Represented By: Paul M. Sterbcow
Represented By: Beth Elster Abramson
Represented By: Conrad S. P. Williams, III
Represented By: David Alan Abramson
Represented By: Ian F. Taylor
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Ibert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Bryan Mires
Represented By: Paul M. Sterbcow
Represented By: Beth Elster Abramson
Represented By: Conrad S. P. Williams, III
Represented By: David Alan Abramson
Represented By: Ian F. Taylor
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Ibert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Krista Vercher
Represented By: Paul M. Sterbcow
Represented By: Beth Elster Abramson
Represented By: Conrad S. P. Williams, III
Represented By: David Alan Abramson
Represented By: Ian F. Taylor
Represented By: James Harvey Domengeaux
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Ibert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Yvette J. Ledet
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Brian James Mersman
Represented By: Jacki Lyall Smith
Represented By: Jay Christopher Zainey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dwayne Lewis
Represented By: Richard Massie Martin, Jr.
Represented By: Frank E. Lamothe, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Janet Hartford
Represented By: Kristi Ann Post
Represented By: David Christopher Whitmore
Represented By: Lawrence Blake Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Antranae Hartford
Represented By: Kristi Ann Post
Represented By: David Christopher Whitmore
Represented By: Lawrence Blake Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Shelia Wallingsford
Represented By: Thomas Massa Discon
Represented By: Charlotte Discon Strief
Represented By: Robert Lansden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Verley Williams
Represented By: Blake R. David
Represented By: Jerome H. Moroux
Represented By: Scott Michael Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Bryson Williams
Represented By: Blake R. David
Represented By: Jerome H. Moroux
Represented By: Scott Michael Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: June Bergeron Rozands
Represented By: Huntington B. Downer, Jr
Represented By: David C. Pellegrin
Represented By: Ellen Daigle Doskey
Represented By: Joseph Lee Waitz, III
Represented By: Joseph Lee Waitz, Jr.
Represented By: Mary W. Riviere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Charlton Peter Rozands, Jr
Represented By: Huntington B. Downer, Jr
Represented By: David C. Pellegrin
Represented By: Ellen Daigle Doskey
Represented By: Joseph Lee Waitz, III
Represented By: Joseph Lee Waitz, Jr.
Represented By: Mary W. Riviere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Rathey Encalade
Represented By: Leo J Palazzo
Represented By: Jason J. Markey
Represented By: Mario A. Arteaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Brandy Norris
Represented By: Daniel Breard Snellings
Represented By: A. Spencer Gulden
Represented By: Glenn Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lynn Shields Warren
Represented By: James E. Shields, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Charles Scallan, Jr.
Represented By: David C. Laborde
Represented By: David C. Laborde, Jr
Represented By: Derrick Glenn Earles
Represented By: Madeleine Brumley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Semco LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Talos Energy LLC
Represented By: George Burton Jurgens, III
Represented By: Alexander J Baynham
Represented By: Brett D. Wise
Represented By: James Denman Bercaw
Represented By: Jedd Spencer Malish
Represented By: Kelly Titus Scalise
Represented By: Thomas Pollard Diaz
Represented By: Timothy S. Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Donjon Marine Co Inc
Represented By: Henry J. Rodriguez
Represented By: Antonio J. Rodriguez
Represented By: Jonathan Joseph Segarra
Represented By: Michael A Harowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Donjon-Smit, LLC
Represented By: Henry J. Rodriguez
Represented By: Antonio J. Rodriguez
Represented By: Jonathan Joseph Segarra
Represented By: Michael A Harowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?