U.S. Alliance Group, Inc. v. Cardtronics USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: U.S. Alliance Group, Inc.
Defendant: Cardtronics USA, Inc. and Columbus Data Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01074
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Electronic Record on Appeal Access Granted to James C. Huber re #111 Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 23-30082. Instructions for access are posted on http://www.ca5.uscourts.gov/docs/default-source/forms/instructions-for-electronic-record-download-feature-of-cm.pdf (as)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Electronic Record on Appeal Access Granted to Timothy George Schafer re #111 Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 23-30082. Instructions for access are posted on http://www.ca5.uscourts.gov/docs/default-source/forms/instructions-for-electronic-record-download-feature-of-cm.pdf (as)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Electronic Record on Appeal Access Granted to Roy L. Schroeder re #111 Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 23-30082. Instructions for access are posted on http://www.ca5.uscourts.gov/docs/default-source/forms/instructions-for-electronic-record-download-feature-of-cm.pdf (as)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 118 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Cardtronics USA, Inc. re #110 MOTION for Attorney Fees . (ko)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #116 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 02/22/2023. (ko)
February 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 116 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply by Cardtronics USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading (Reply))(Cerise, Jason)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Electronic Record on Appeal Access Granted Christopher Dove re #111 Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 23-30082. Instructions for access are posted on http://www.ca5.uscourts.gov/docs/default-source/forms/instructions-for-electronic-record-download-feature-of-cm.pdf (as)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Electronic Record on Appeal Access Granted to Michael David Douglas re #111 Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 23-30082. Instructions for access are posted on http://www.ca5.uscourts.gov/docs/default-source/forms/instructions-for-electronic-record-download-feature-of-cm.pdf (as)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 113 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by U.S. Alliance Group, Inc. re #110 MOTION for Attorney Fees . (Douglas, Michael)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 112 USCA Case Number 23-30082 appealed to USCA Fifth Circuit for #111 Notice of Appeal filed by U.S. Alliance Group, Inc. (mm)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 111 NOTICE OF APPEAL by U.S. Alliance Group, Inc. as to #108 Order and Reasons. (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ALAEDC-9782921.) (Huber, James) Modified on 2/6/2023 to edit text (cbs).
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Cardtronics USA, Inc.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Jason Cerise, #3 Exhibit B - Agreement, #4 Exhibit C - Bill of Costs, #5 Notice of Submission)(Cerise, Jason)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 109 JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED ADJUDGED AND DECREED that plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 1/10/2023.(mm)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER AND REASONS dismissing as moot #56 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; dismissing as moot #61 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting #62 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; dismissing as moot #63 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; dismissing as moot #81 Motion to Strike for the reasons set forth in document. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 1/9/2023. (mm)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #106 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Timothy George Schafer, Roy L. Schroeder for U.S. Alliance Group, Inc. Attorney Brittany Holt Alexander and Gregory T. Stevens terminated. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 1/4/2023. (mm)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 106 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Timothy G. Schafer and Roy L. Schroeder to be substituted in place of Gregory T. Stevens and Brittany Alexander by U.S. Alliance Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Roy L. Schroeder added to party U.S. Alliance Group, Inc.(pty:pla).(Schroeder, Roy)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER AND REASONS granting #55 MOTION to Strike Peisner Report and to Exclude Prospective Testimony of Peisner for the reasons stated herein. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 12/13/2022. (mm)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Cardtronics USA, Inc. re #63 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing USAG's Causes of Action for Intentional Interference and Unfair Competition. (mm)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting #92 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/23/2022. (mm)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 **SEALED** REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Cardtronics USA, Inc. re #62 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Affirmative Defense of Release. (mm)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #91 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/22/2022. (mm)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #90 Motion to Seal Reply in Support of R. Doc 62. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/22/2022. (mm)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Cardtronics USA, Inc. re #55 MOTION to Strike Peisner Report MOTION to Exclude Prospective Testimony of Peisner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit)(mm)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting #87 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/22/2022. (mm)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Cardtronics USA, Inc. re #56 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing USAG's Cause of Action for Promissory Fraud. (mm)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #85 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/22/2022. (mm)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by U.S. Alliance Group, Inc. re #81 MOTION to Strike #61 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Precluding an Award of Consequential and Punitive Damages, #63 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing USAG's Causes of Action for Intentional Interference and Unf, #85 MOTION for Leave to File Reply, #86 MOTION for Leave to File Reply, #87 MOTION for Leave to File Reply, #91 MOTION for Leave to File Reply . (Huber, James)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply by Cardtronics USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Cerise, Jason) Modified on 11/23/2022 to edit text (cbs).
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply re: rec. doc. 62 by Cardtronics USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading (sealed-see motion filed at rec. doc. 90))(Cerise, Jason)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Seal Document Reply in Support of R. Doc 62 by Cardtronics USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Notice of Request to Seal, #4 Proposed Order)(Cerise, Jason) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/21/2022: #5 **SEALED** Proposed Pleading) (mm).
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 OBJECTIONS by Cardtronics USA, Inc. re #75 Declaration, Objection to Summary Judgment Evidence (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Cerise, Jason)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Cardtronics USA, Inc. re #81 MOTION to Strike #61 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, #63 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, #62 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, #56 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Cerise, Jason) Modified text on 11/22/2022 (mm).
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply re: rec. doc. 55 by Cardtronics USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Proposed Pleading-Exhibit 1, #4 Proposed Pleading-Exhibit)(Cerise, Jason) Modified text on 11/22/2022 (mm).
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply re: rec. doc. 63 by Cardtronics USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Cerise, Jason) Modified text on 11/22/2022 (mm).
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply re: rec. doc. 56 by Cardtronics USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Cerise, Jason) Modified text on 11/22/2022 (mm).
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER DENYING ORAL ARGUMENT re #83 Request/Statement of Oral Argument, #80 Request/Statement of Oral Argument, #79 Request/Statement of Oral Argument, #82 Request/Statement of Oral Argument. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/21/2022.(mm)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by U.S. Alliance Group, Inc. regarding #55 MOTION to Strike Peisner Report MOTION to Exclude Prospective Testimony of Peisner . (Huber, James)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by U.S. Alliance Group, Inc. regarding #62 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on the Affirmative Defense of Release . (Huber, James)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MOTION to Strike #61 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Precluding an Award of Consequential and Punitive Damages, #63 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing USAG's Causes of Action for Intentional Interference and Unfair Competition, #62 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on the Affirmative Defense of Release, #56 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing USAG's Cause of Action for Promissory Fraud by U.S. Alliance Group, Inc.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Proposed Order)(Huber, James)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Cardtronics USA, Inc. regarding #62 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on the Affirmative Defense of Release (Cerise, Jason)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Cardtronics USA, Inc. regarding #55 MOTION to Strike Peisner Report MOTION to Exclude Prospective Testimony of Peisner (Cerise, Jason)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ***DEFICIENT*** MOTION to Strike #61 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Precluding an Award of Consequential and Punitive Damages, #63 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing USAG's Causes of Action for Intentional Interference and Unfair Competition, #62 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on the Affirmative Defense of Release, #56 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing USAG's Cause of Action for Promissory Fraud by U.S. Alliance Group, Inc.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission Notice of Submission of Motion to Strike Motions for Partial Summary Judgment per Local Rule 7.7)(Huber, James) Modified on 11/17/2022 (cbs).
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by U.S. Alliance Group, Inc. re #56 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing USAG's Cause of Action for Promissory Fraud . (Attachments: #1 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts)(Huber, James) Modified on 11/16/2022 to edit text (cbs).
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by U.S. Alliance Group, Inc. re #61 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Precluding an Award of Consequential and Punitive Damages . (Attachments: #1 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #2 Exhibit Excerpts from Cowart Depo 2022.09.26, #3 Exhibit Excerpts from Singh depo 2022.09.27, #4 Exhibit Excerpts from McCrary Depo 09-28-2022)(Huber, James) Modified on 11/16/2022 to edit text (cbs).
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Declaration by U.S. Alliance Group, Inc. Fadi Declaration ISO MSJ Oppositions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- 5 MPAs, #2 Exhibit B- 2021.04.22 email re Moon, LibertyX, #3 Exhibit C- Referrer Services Agreement, #4 Exhibit D- 000016 Document 16 - CDS020170, #5 Exhibit E- CDS020031, #6 Exhibit F- p1)(Huber, James) Modified on 11/16/2022 to edit text (cbs).
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by U.S. Alliance Group, Inc. re #63 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing USAG's Causes of Action for Intentional Interference and Unfair Competition . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Excerpts from the Cheikha Depo 2022.09.12, #2 Exhibit Excerpts from Yim Depo 2022.10.25, #3 Exhibit Excerpts from Singh Depo 2022.09.27, #4 Exhibit Excerpts from Cowart Depo 2022.09.28, #5 Exhibit Excerpts from Cowart Depo 2022.10.27, #6 Exhibit Excerpts from Cowart Depo 2022.10.27, #7 2022.11.14 Evid Obj ISO Oppo to Def's partial MSJ re Intentional Interference, #8 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #9 Exhibit CDS007030-007041, #10 Exhibit CDS020031-020035, #11 Exhibit CDS020170-020173, #12 2022.11.14 Huber Declaration ISO Oppos, #13 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Huber Decl 2021.05.21 email re Moon, LibertyX Draft SA, #14 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Huber Decl Pages 105-116, 149-156 from Cheikha Depo part 1 pp1-264, #15 Exhibit Ex. 3 to Huber Decl Pages from COWART, MICHAEL 09-26-2022_full, #16 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Huber Decl Pages 55-56 from SINGH, GARIMA 09-27-2022_NON-CONF_full, #17 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Huber Decl Page 48 from MCCRARY, DAVID B. 09-28-2022_full, #18 Exhibit Ex. 6 to Huber Decl Pages 57-59 from 30(b)(6)_YIM, CHRIS 10-25-2022_full, #19 Exhibit Ex. 7 to Huber Decl)(Huber, James) Modified on 11/16/2022 to edit text (cbs).
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by U.S. Alliance Group, Inc. re #63 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing USAG's Causes of Action for Intentional Interference and Unfair Competition PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 7.7 IN OPPOSITION TO SAID MOTIONS. (Huber, James)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #55 MOTION to Strike Peisner Report MOTION to Exclude Prospective Testimony of Peisner . (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Huber, James)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MOTION for Leave to File PLEADINGS AND SUPPORTING EXHBITS UNDER SEAL by U.S. Alliance Group, Inc.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Memo of Law ISO Mtn to Seal, #3 Notice of Request to Seal, #4 USAGs Proposed Order to Seal)(Huber, James)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #69 Motion for Extension of Deadlines To File Oppositions and Replies Re Motions for Partial Summary Judgment and Motion to Strike Expert Testimony. Deadlines are set forth in document. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/8/2022. (mm)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 EXPARTE/CONSENT JOINT MOTION for Extension of Deadlines To File Oppositions and Replies Re Motions for Partial Summary Judgment and Motion to Strike Expert Testimony by U.S. Alliance Group, Inc, Cardtronics USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Huber, James) Modified filers on 11/8/2022 (mm).
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Deadlines are set forth in document. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/1/2022. (mm)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #60 Motion to Seal Documents. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/1/2022. (mm)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #65 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. **Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #61 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Precluding an Award of Consequential and Punitive Damages, #63 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing USAG's Causes of Action for Intentional Interference and Unfair Competition, #55 MOTION to Strike Peisner Report MOTION to Exclude Prospective Testimony of Peisner, #62 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on the Affirmative Defense of Release, #56 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing USAG's Cause of Action for Promissory Fraud by U.S. Alliance Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Huber, James) Modified text/removed referral on 11/1/2022 (mm).
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #60 MOTION to Seal Documents. **1. Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent Motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte' and removed submission date. 2. The title of the attached proposed order should not include the word Proposed but only reflect Order on the actual document. (mm)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing USAG's Causes of Action for Intentional Interference and Unfair Competition by Cardtronics USA, Inc.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #3 Notice of Submission, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4 (sealed), #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11 (sealed), #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 16)(Cerise, Jason)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on the Affirmative Defense of Release by Cardtronics USA, Inc.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support (sealed), #2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts (sealed), #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3 (sealed), #6 Exhibit 4 (sealed), #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Notice of Submission)(Cerise, Jason)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Precluding an Award of Consequential and Punitive Damages by Cardtronics USA, Inc.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5 (sealed), #8 Exhibit 6 (sealed), #9 Notice of Submission)(Cerise, Jason)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Seal Documents to rec. docs. 61, 62, and 63 by Cardtronics USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Notice of Request to Seal, #4 Proposed Order)(Cerise, Jason) Modified text/removed submission date on 10/31/2022 (mm).
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Witness List by Cardtronics USA, Inc.. (Cerise, Jason)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Exhibit List by Cardtronics USA, Inc.. (Cerise, Jason)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Witness and Exhibit List by U.S. Alliance Group, Inc.. (Huber, James)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing USAG's Cause of Action for Promissory Fraud by Cardtronics USA, Inc.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5)(Cerise, Jason)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION to Strike Peisner Report and to Exclude Prospective Testimony of Peisner by Cardtronics USA, Inc.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit Ex. 1, #4 Exhibit Ex. 2, #5 Exhibit Ex. 3)(Cerise, Jason) Modified on 10/31/2022 to edit text (cbs).
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #53 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael David Douglas. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 10/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (mm)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael David Douglas (Fee previously paid) by U.S. Alliance Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit in Support, #3 Consent to E-Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Stevens, Gregory)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ***DEFICIENT*** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-9591237) by U.S. Alliance Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Affidavit in Support, #3 Exhibit Consent to E-Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Stevens, Gregory) Modified on 10/7/2022 (cbs).
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Cardtronics USA, Inc. (cwa)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 10/5/2022. (cwa)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that oral argument for Defendant Cardtronics' Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer is hereby jointly waived and taken off calendar. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 10/4/2022. (cwa)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Waiver of Request of Oral Argument by U.S. Alliance Group, Inc. re #43 Order, #44 Waiver, #42 Request/Statement of Oral Argument (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Huber, James) Modified text/event on 10/4/2022 (mm).
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Cardtronics USA, Inc. re #40 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(cwa)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 10/4/2022. (cwa)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of its Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer re: rec. doc. 40 by Cardtronics USA, Inc. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Proposed Pleading-Exhibit 1, #4 Proposed Pleading-Exhibit 2, #5 Proposed Pleading-Exhibit 3, #6 Proposed Pleading-Exhibit 4, #7 Proposed Pleading-Exhibit 5)(Cerise, Jason)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 DEFICIENT: Waiver by U.S. Alliance Group, Inc. of Request for Oral Argument (Huber, James) Modified text on 10/4/2022 (mm).
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that oral argument is scheduled for WEDNESDAY, OCTOBER 5, 2022, at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault, 500 Poydras Street, Hale Boggs Building, Room B-421, New Orleans, Louisiana. The hearing will be conducted in person, unless otherwise notified by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 9/29/2022.(cwa)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by U.S. Alliance Group, Inc. regarding #40 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer (Huber, James)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by U.S. Alliance Group, Inc. re #40 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer . (Huber, James)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer by Cardtronics USA, Inc.. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Pleading)(Cerise, Jason)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ***DEFICIENT*** MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer by Cardtronics USA, Inc.. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Proposed Pleading (refiled to correct and attach proposed pleading))(Cerise, Jason) Modified on 9/19/2022 (cbs).
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ***ERROR - DUPLICATE FILING*** MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer by Cardtronics USA, Inc.. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission)(Cerise, Jason) Modified on 9/19/2022 (cbs).
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #32 MOTION to Extend Trial Date. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 3/2/2023 12:00 PM before Judge Sarah S. Vance. Jury Trial reset for 3/13/2023 08:30 AM before Judge Sarah S. Vance. All discovery must be completed by 10/28/2022. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form) (NEF: MAG-2)(cbs)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #34 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend the Trial Date. **Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #32 MOTION to Extend Trial Date. **Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent Motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte' and removed submission date.** (mm)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend the Trial Date re: rec. doc. 32 by U.S. Alliance Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Proposed Order)(Huber, James) Modified text/removed referral on 8/11/2022 (mm).
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by U.S. Alliance Group, Inc. regarding #32 MOTION to Extend Trial Date. (Huber, James)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Extend Trial Date by U.S. Alliance Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Motion and Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Huber, James) Modified text/removed submission date on 8/11/2022 (mm).
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Cardtronics USA, Inc.(Cerise, Jason)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and denying in part #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cardtronics USA, Inc. The Court DISMISSES plaintiff's breach-of-contract claims under sections 2.5, 2.6, 3.3, 6.2, 6.3, 7.1, and 9.1, with leave to amend. The Court DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE plaintiff's unjust-enrichment claim. As to the remainder of plaintiff's claims, the Court DENIES defendant's motion to dismiss. Additionally, Cardtronics's motion for a more definite statement is DENIED. Plaintiff must file any amended complaint by Friday, February 11, 2022. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 1/28/2022.(sbs)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Christian Perez. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 1/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (mm)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to M. Jonathan Pelayo. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 1/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (mm)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING #23 Consent Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 1/19/2022. (sa)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #23 Joint MOTION for Protective Order . The Motion was image as 8-1/2 x 14. All documents should be 8-1/2 x 11. Clerk has corrected the image. (lw)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christian Perez (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-9187786) by Cardtronics USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Cerise, Jason)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan Pelayo (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-9187705) by Cardtronics USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Cerise, Jason)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION for Protective Order by U.S. Alliance Group, Inc., Cardtronics USA, Inc. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stevens, Gregory) (Main Document 23 replaced on 1/19/2022) (lw). Modified filer/text on 1/19/2022 (lw).
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/11/2022 10:30 AM before Judge Sarah S. Vance. Jury Trial set for 10/24/2022 08:30 AM before Judge Sarah S. Vance. All discovery must be completed by 8/23/2022. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 10/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pre-Trial Notice)(mm) (NEF: MJ)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference reset for 10/22/2021 at 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(sbs)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Cardtronics USA, Inc. re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (mm)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/10/2021. (mm)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply re: rec. doc. 15 by Cardtronics USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Cerise, Jason)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE: IT IS ORDERED that a preliminary conference will be held BY TELEPHONE on SEPTEMBER 14, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. for the purpose of scheduling a pre-trial conference and trial on the merits, and for a discussion of the status of the case and discovery deadlines as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/9/2021.(mm)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by U.S. Alliance Group, Inc. re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Huber, James)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Cardtronics USA, Inc. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Notice of Submission)(mm)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/26/2021. (mm)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Cardtronics USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading - Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #3 Proposed Pleading - Memorandum in Support, #4 Proposed Pleading - Exhibit A, #5 Proposed Pleading - Notice of Submission)(Cerise, Jason)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Cardtronics USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent NCR Corporation for Cardtronics USA, Inc. (Cerise, Jason)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DEFICIENT: MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Cardtronics USA, Inc. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Notice of Submission)(Cerise, Jason) Modified text on 7/19/2021 (mm).
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings re #1 Complaint as to Cardtronics USA, Inc.; answer due 7/16/2021. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/8/2021. (mm)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Cardtronics USA, Inc. served on 6/4/2021, answer due 6/25/2021. (Stevens, Gregory) Modified text on 6/8/2021 (mm).
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings re #1 Complaint by Cardtronics USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Jason Marechal Cerise added to party Cardtronics USA, Inc.(pty:dft).(Cerise, Jason)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to James C. Huber. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (mm)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DEFICIENT: SUMMONS Returned Executed; Cardtronics USA, Inc. served on 6/4/2021, answer due 6/25/2021. (Stevens, Gregory) Modified text on 6/7/2021 (mm).
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice James Cannon Huber (Fee previously paid) by U.S. Alliance Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James Cannon Huber, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Stevens, Gregory)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cardtronics USA, Inc. (bm)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice James Cannon Huber (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8886876) by U.S. Alliance Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Standing, #2 Affidavit of James Cannon Huber, #3 Proposed Order)(Stevens, Gregory) Modified text on 6/3/2021 (mm).
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (go)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Cardtronics USA, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8886485) filed by U.S. Alliance Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Gregory T. Stevens added to party U.S. Alliance Group, Inc.(pty:pla).(Stevens, Gregory) Modified text on 6/4/2021 (bm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Alliance Group, Inc. v. Cardtronics USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardtronics USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Marechal Cerise
Represented By: Christian Perez
Represented By: M. Jonathan Pelayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbus Data Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Alliance Group, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory T. Stevens
Represented By: Brittany Holt Alexander
Represented By: James C. Huber
Represented By: Michael David Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?