Dong Phuong Bakery, Inc. v. Gemini Society, LLC
Plaintiff: Dong Phuong Bakery, Inc.
Defendant: The Gemini Society, LLC and Gemini Society, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01109
Filed: June 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date for 14 Motion to Dismiss by Gemini Society, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fincher, Micah)
August 3, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition to re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dong Phuong Bakery, Inc. (Vickers, Adam) Modified text on 8/4/2021 (pp).
July 27, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Gemini Society, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Notice of Submission)(Fincher, Micah)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The defendant shall have until 8/2/2021 to file responsive pleadings to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 6/29/2021. (pp)
June 29, 2021 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Gemini Society, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Joseph F. Lavigne added to party Gemini Society, LLC (pty:dft).(Lavigne, Joseph)
June 23, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Gemini Society, LLC served on 6/19/2021, answer due 7/12/2021. (Butler, Amanda)
June 23, 2021 Filing 10 FILED IN ERROR--SEE REC DOC. 11---AFFIDAVIT of Service by Rob Henderson of Affidavit of Service served on Texas Secretary of State as Agent for Service of Process on 6/18/2021. (Butler, Amanda) Modified on 6/23/2021 (cg).
June 17, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Gemini Society, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(cg)
June 17, 2021 Filing 8 Request of Summons Issued as to Gemini Society, LLC filed by Dong Phuong Bakery, Inc. re #1 Complaint,. (Butler, Amanda)
June 17, 2021 Filing 7 Request of Summons Issued as to Gemini Society, LLC filed by Dong Phuong Bakery, Inc. re #1 Complaint,. (Butler, Amanda)
June 17, 2021 Filing 6 Request of Summons Issued as to Gemini Society, LLC filed by Dong Phuong Bakery, Inc. re #1 Complaint,. (Butler, Amanda)
June 9, 2021 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (cg)
June 9, 2021 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Attachment has duplicate description. For attachment, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action. (bm)
June 9, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Gemini Society, LLC. (bm)
June 8, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
June 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Gemini Society, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8893572) filed by Dong Phuong Bakery, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Summons Gemini Society LLC ) Attorney Amanda Jeanne Butler added to party Dong Phuong Bakery, Inc.(pty:pla).(Butler, Amanda) Modified text on 6/9/2021 (bm). Modified on 6/14/2021 (gec).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dong Phuong Bakery, Inc. v. Gemini Society, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dong Phuong Bakery, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda Jeanne Butler
Represented By: Adam Vincent Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Gemini Society, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gemini Society, LLC
Represented By: Micah John Fincher
Represented By: Joseph F. Lavigne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?