Logiudice v. Nelson Coleman Correctional Center et al
Plaintiff: Nicolo Evola Logiudice, Jr.
Defendant: Nelson Coleman Correctional Center, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center and Allen Correctional Center
Case Number: 2:2021cv01148
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE regarding Local Civil Rule 54.7. (sa)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Allen Correctional Center, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center, Nelson Coleman Correctional Center. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (2 cc: to Plaintiff via US Mail - Summons, Pauper Letter, Pauper Order, Complaints) (sa)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 6/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pauper Letter) (sa)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nicolo Evola Logiudice, Jr. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (sbs)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. If Plaintiff re-files, Plaintiff must clearly and fully disclose all information regarding assets and income, including benefits such as social security or unemployment compensation, as well as monthly expenses, debts owed, and child support obligations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 6/22/2021. (sa)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nicolo Evola Logiudice, Jr. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (sbs)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Allen Correctional Center, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center, Nelson Coleman Correctional Center filed by Nicolo Evola Logiudice, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Allen C.C., #3 Summons E. Hunt C.C., #4 Summons Nelson Coleman C.C.)(sbs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Logiudice v. Nelson Coleman Correctional Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson Coleman Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elayn Hunt Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicolo Evola Logiudice, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?