Finney et al v. Board of Commissioners of the Port of New Orleans et al
Plaintiff: Darre Finney, Glenda Marie Finney and Glenda Marie Smith
Defendant: M/V CMA CGM BIANCA, The Board of Commissioners of the Port of New Orleans, Teucarrier No. 3 Corp., Board of Commissioners of the Port of New Orleans and CMA CGM Bianca M/V
Case Number: 2:2021cv01186
Filed: June 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Martin LC Feldman
2 Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE continuing the scheduling conference pending a ruling on the motion to consolidate. By Clerk. (jrc)
August 6, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION to Consolidate Case 21-1186 into Civil Action No. 20-2179 by Teucarrier No. 3 Corp. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Waters, Andrew) Modified text on 8/9/2021 (jls).
August 5, 2021 Filing 24 **DEFICIENT** MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Teucarrier No. 3 Corp.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Proposed Order)(Waters, Andrew) Modified on 8/6/2021 (jls).
July 27, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, and Rule 14(C) Tender by Board of Commissioners of the Port of New Orleans.(Wogan, Hansford)
July 23, 2021 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Darre Finney, Glenda Marie Smith re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (jls)
July 23, 2021 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Darre Finney, Glenda Marie Smith re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (jls)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 7/23/2021. (jls)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 7/23/2021. (jls)
July 23, 2021 Filing 18 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by Darre Finney, Glenda Marie Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Stephens, Barrett)
July 23, 2021 Filing 17 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by Darre Finney, Glenda Marie Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Stephens, Barrett)
July 20, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Teucarrier No. 3 Corp. re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Waguespack, Jason)
July 20, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Board of Commissioners of the Port of New Orleans re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Wogan, Hansford)
July 15, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 8/6/2021 10:15 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (jrc)
July 9, 2021 Filing 13 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #12 Answer to Complaint. Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document 12 to document 1. (bw)
July 9, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint #1 by Teucarrier No. 3 Corp.(Waguespack, Jason) Modified text/link on 7/9/2021 (bw).
July 7, 2021 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court. **The motion and notice of submission were filed on incorrect sized paper. Local Rule 10.1E states 'All papers drafted for filing in this court shall be on 8-1/2 by 11 inch paper'. Clerk has reduced images. No further action needed.** (jls)
July 7, 2021 Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Consent to Removal, #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, and #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court. **The case caption of all future filings should include only the case number and caption for this case.There has not been a consolidation order issued in this case at this time.** (jls)
July 6, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Darre Finney, Glenda Marie Smith. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit 1 - Petition for Damages, #4 Exhibit 2 - First Supplemental and Amended Petition for Damages)(Stephens, Barrett) (Main Document 9 and Attachment 1 replaced to correct size on 7/7/2021) (jls).
July 2, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to M/V CMA CGM BIANCA by All Plaintiffs. (Stephens, Barrett) Modified text on 7/7/2021 (jls).
June 23, 2021 Filing 7 Consent to Removal by Board of Commissioners of the Port of New Orleans (Wogan, Hansford)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Judge Martin L.C. Feldman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/22/2021. (NEF: Section G)(sbs)
June 21, 2021 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. 1. Multiple documents were incorrectly filed as one PDF, the Civil Cover Sheet and Notice of Partial Compliance. The Civil Cover Sheet, only, should have been filed as attachment(s) to Notice of Removal. 2. The Notice of Partial Compliance should be filed as a separate docket entry instead of an attachment to the Notice of Removal. Clerk took corrective action by separating this attachment(s) and docketing it as a separate entry. (bw)
June 21, 2021 Filing 4 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Teucarrier No. 3 Corp. By the Clerk. (bw)
June 21, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Partial Compliance by CMA CGM Bianca M/V, Teucarrier No. 3 Corp. re #1 Notice of Removal. (bw)
June 18, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2021-4424 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8909895) filed by M/V CMA CGM BIANCA, Teucarrier No. 3 Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Petition), #2 Exhibit B (State Court Record), #3 Civil Cover Sheet )Attorney Jason P. Waguespack added to party M/V CMA CGM BIANCA(pty:dft), Attorney Jason P. Waguespack added to party Teucarrier No. 3 Corp.(pty:dft).(Waguespack, Jason) (Attachment 3 replaced on 6/21/2021) (bw). Modified text on 6/21/2021 (bw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finney et al v. Board of Commissioners of the Port of New Orleans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darre Finney
Represented By: Pete Lewis
Represented By: Barrett Robert Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Marie Finney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Marie Smith
Represented By: Pete Lewis
Represented By: Barrett Robert Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V CMA CGM BIANCA
Represented By: Jason P. Waguespack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Commissioners of the Port of New Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teucarrier No. 3 Corp.
Represented By: Jason P. Waguespack
Represented By: Andrew Vincent Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Commissioners of the Port of New Orleans
Represented By: Hansford P. Wogan
Represented By: Glenn Gill Goodier
Represented By: Jeanne Louise Amy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMA CGM Bianca M/V
Represented By: Jason P. Waguespack
Represented By: Andrew Vincent Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?