Sacco v. Offshore Liftboats, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Chad V Sacco
Defendant: Offshore Liftboats, LLC, C-Dive, LLC and C-Dive, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01241
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; C-Dive, L.L.C. served on 6/29/2021, answer due 7/20/2021. (Jevic, Joseph)
July 1, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Offshore Liftboats, LLC served on 6/30/2021, answer due 7/21/2021. (Jevic, Joseph)
June 28, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to C-Dive, LLC, Offshore Liftboats, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(bw)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C-Dive, LLC, Offshore Liftboats, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8919670) filed by Chad V Sacco. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Offshore Liftboats, #3 Summons C-Dive)Attorney Charles Clarence Bourque, Jr added to party Chad V Sacco(pty:pla).(Bourque, Charles) Modified text on 6/28/2021 (bw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sacco v. Offshore Liftboats, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad V Sacco
Represented By: Charles Clarence Bourque, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph G. Jevic, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Offshore Liftboats, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C-Dive, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C-Dive, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?