Jerome v. Ariens Company et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Jerome
Defendant: Ariens Company and Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01292
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE Scheduling Conference set for 9/9/2021 11:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(dp)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 MOTION to Continue Preliminary Scheduling Conference. The Preliminary Scheduling Conference is continued. The Court's Case Manager will notice a new date and time. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 08/23/2021.(ko)
August 18, 2021 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Preliminary Scheduling Conference by Ariens Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parkerson, Godfrey)
August 3, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE Scheduling Conference set for 8/26/2021 11:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(dp)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jason Scott Turchin. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 08/02/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (ko)
August 2, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Ariens Company. Attorney Godfrey Bruce Parkerson added to party Ariens Company(pty:dft).(Parkerson, Godfrey)
July 30, 2021 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jason Turchin (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8974085) by Joseph Jerome. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit-Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit-Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Thomas, Benjamin)
July 16, 2021 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Notice of Compliance. **Filing attorney should have linked filing to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm)
July 16, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Compliance by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings)(Murley, Caroline) Modified linkage on 7/16/2021 (mm).
July 14, 2021 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lowe's Companies, Inc. for Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Murley, Caroline)
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal. **Document does not contain Section and Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section T and Magistrate (4).** (mm)
July 13, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC.(Murley, Caroline)
July 6, 2021 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b)re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. By the Clerk. (bw)
July 2, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
July 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2021-03861 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8932444) filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Caroline M. Murley added to party Lowe's Home Centers, LLC(pty:dft).(Murley, Caroline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jerome v. Ariens Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Jerome
Represented By: Seth Joseph Smiley
Represented By: Benjamin James Thomas
Represented By: Jason Scott Turchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ariens Company
Represented By: Godfrey Bruce Parkerson
Represented By: Katherine Honeywell Amoss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Caroline M. Murley
Represented By: Paul J. Politz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?