K.K. v. St Catherine of Siena School et al
Plaintiff: K. K.
Defendant: St Catherine of Siena Roman Catholic Church, Maria Ward, Timothy Hedrick, St Catherine of Siena School and St. Catherine of Siena Roman Catholic Church, Metairie, Louisiana Doc. 10; Erroneously named as St. Catherine of Siena Roman Catholic Church and St. Catherine of Siena School; Individually and doing business as St Catherine of Siena School
Case Number: 2:2021cv01339
Filed: July 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12181
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Timothy Hedrick, St. Catherine of Siena Roman Catholic Church, Metairie, Louisiana, Maria Ward answer due 9/7/2021. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 08/17/2021. (ko)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. **Filing attorney should have linked filing to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint by Timothy Hedrick, St Catherine of Siena Roman Catholic Church, Metairie, Louisiana, Maria Ward. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Michael L. DeShazo added to party Timothy Hedrick(pty:dft), Attorney Michael L. DeShazo added to party St Catherine of Siena Roman Catholic Church, Metairie, Louisiana(pty:dft), Attorney Michael L. DeShazo added to party Maria Ward(pty:dft).(DeShazo, Michael) Modified text/added linkage on 8/16/2021 (mm).
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Timothy Hedrick served on 7/29/2021, answer due 8/19/2021. (Edmunds, Christopher)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Maria Ward served on 7/27/2021, answer due 8/17/2021. (Edmunds, Christopher)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; St Catherine of Siena Roman Catholic Church served on 7/29/2021, answer due 8/19/2021. (Edmunds, Christopher)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Timothy Hedrick, St Catherine of Siena Roman Catholic Church, St Catherine of Siena School, Maria Ward. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(bw)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Request of Summons Issued as to Timothy Hedrick filed by K.K. re #1 Complaint. (Edmunds, Christopher) Modified text on 7/14/2021 (bw).
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Request of Summons Issued as to Maria Ward filed by K.K. re #1 Complaint. (Edmunds, Christopher) Modified text on 7/14/2021 (bw).
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Request of Summons Issued as to St Catherine of Siena Roman Catholic Church filed by K.K. re #1 Complaint. (Edmunds, Christopher) Modified text on 7/14/2021 (bw).
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (aj)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Timothy Hedrick, St Catherine of Siena Roman Catholic Church, Maria Ward (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8950004) filed by K.K.(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Christopher F Edmunds added to party K.K.(pty:pla).(Edmunds, Christopher) Modified text on 7/14/2021 (bw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K.K. v. St Catherine of Siena School et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. K.
Represented By: Christopher F Edmunds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Catherine of Siena Roman Catholic Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Ward
Represented By: Michael L. DeShazo
Represented By: Christine Wadkins Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Hedrick
Represented By: Michael L. DeShazo
Represented By: Christine Wadkins Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Catherine of Siena School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Catherine of Siena Roman Catholic Church, Metairie, Louisiana Doc. 10; Erroneously named as St. Catherine of Siena Roman Catholic Church and St. Catherine of Siena School; Individually and doing business as St Catherine of Siena School
Represented By: Michael L. DeShazo
Represented By: Christine Wadkins Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?