Miller v. Hooper
Plaintiff: Corey Miller
Defendant: Timothy Hooper
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Case Number: 2:2021cv01413
Filed: July 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #3 MOTION to Stay re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), Pending Exhaustion of State Remedies. Respondent shall have a final extension of thirty days, through October 16, 2021, as set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 9/22/2021. (jeg)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 EXPARTE/CONSENT Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Stay re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), Pending Exhaustion of State Remedies by Timothy Hooper. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Clark, Juliet)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 EXPARTE/CONSENT Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), by Timothy Hooper. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Clark, Juliet)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion for Extension of Time. Respondent shall have an additional fourteen (14) days, or through September 16, 2021, to file an response as set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 9/13/2021. (jeg)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Stay re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), by Timothy Hooper. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Clark, Juliet) Modified text, added links on 9/3/2021 (sbs)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Respondent shall have an additional seven (7) days or until 9/2/2021, to file a response to petitioner's motion to stay these proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 8/27/2021. (caa)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), as to Timothy Hooper answer due 9/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 8/27/2021. (caa)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Stay re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), Pending Exhaustion of State Remedies by Timothy Hooper. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Clark, Juliet)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), by Timothy Hooper. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Juliet L. Clark added to party Timothy Hooper(pty:dft).(Clark, Juliet)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Return of Service of H/C Response Order served on Jefferson Parish Clerk, Jefferson Parish District Attorney's Office on 8/3/2021; served on Attorney General's Office on 8/4/2021(mm)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Return of Service of H/C Response Order served on Jefferson Parish Clerk, Attorney General's Office on 8/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Green Card-Attorney General's Office)(mm)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Return of Service of H/C Response Order served on Jefferson Parish District Attorney's Office on 7/30/2021.(mm)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Habeas Corpus Response Order that Attorney General for the State of Louisiana and the District Attorney for Jefferson Parish respond to the petition of Habeas Corpus within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 7/27/2021.(jeg)(CC: Louisiana Attorney General, Jefferson Parish DA, and Jefferson Parish Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2021: #1 Certified Mail Receipts) (jeg).
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 MOTION to Stay re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), Pending Exhaustion of State Remedies. Filing attorney should have selected Yes at the question Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N? Exparte/Consent Motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to reflect Exparte and remove submission date. (lw)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254). Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The pdf should not have the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk took corrective action. (lw)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
July 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Stay re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), Pending Exhaustion of State Remedies by Corey Miller. Motion(s) referred to Judge Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hogan, Jane) Modified text on 7/26/2021 (lw).
July 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Amendment/Supplement to Document by Corey Miller re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), Vol III of III (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Hogan, Jane)
July 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number ALAEDC-8965298) filed by Corey Miller. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Appendix Volume I of III, #3 Appendix Volume II of III, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Jane Catherine Hogan added to party Corey Miller(pty:pet).(Hogan, Jane) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/26/2021) (lw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Miller
Represented By: Jane Catherine Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Hooper
Represented By: Juliet L. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?