C-Dive, L.L.C. v. JAB Energy Solutions LLC et al
Plaintiff: C-Dive, L.L.C.
Defendant: JAB Energy Solutions II, LLC, Allison Marine Holdings, LLC and JAB Energy Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01426
Filed: July 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
2 Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that this action is STAYED and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED pending resolution of In re JAB Energy Solutions II, LLC, Case No. 21-11226-CTG, United States Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of Delaware. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 9/9/2021.(caa)
September 9, 2021 Filing 24 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 46 Notice (Other). Filing attorney selected incorrect event, incorrectly selected JAB Energy Solutions, LLC and Allison Marine Holdings, LLC as a filers and Multiple documents were incorrectly filed as one PDF. Correct event is Notice of Filing Bankruptcy and the Exhibit A should have been filed as attachment to the Notice of Filing Bankruptcy. Clerk took corrective actions. No further action necessary at this time. All future filings should be entered this way.(caa)
September 8, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY by JAB Energy Solutions II, LLC. (Thomas, Miles) (Main Document 23 replaced on 9/9/2021) (caa). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2021: #1 Exhibit A) (caa). Modified on 9/9/2021 (caa).
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that oral argument on Defendants Motion to Dismiss scheduled forWednesday, 9/15/2021 #20 is CONTINUED. Oral argument shall be scheduled for Wednesday, 9/22/2021. Should any party have continued Hurricane Ida impacts that preclude going forward on this date, that party should promptly advise the court and opposing counsel so that an acceptable date may be selected. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 9/7/2021.(caa)
September 4, 2021 Filing 21 EXPARTE/CONSENT Second MOTION to Continue and re-set the submission date regarding Defendants Motion to Dismiss [Rec Doc. 17] by C-Dive, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stassi, Robert)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that the #19 MOTION to Continue Defendants Motion to Dismiss #17 is GRANTED; and that Defendants Motion to Dismiss #17 originally noticed for submission on 9/8/2021 be and is hereby continued and re-set for submission to the Court on 9/15/2021, which makes any opposition now due eight days before the 9/15/2021 submission date pursuant to LR 7.5. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 8/27/2021.(caa)
August 27, 2021 Filing 19 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Defendants Motion to Dismiss [Rec Doc. 17] by C-Dive, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stassi, Robert)
August 24, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Allison Marine Holdings, LLC, JAB Energy Solutions II, LLC, JAB Energy Solutions, LLC re #16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Thomas, Miles)
August 20, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Allison Marine Holdings, LLC, JAB Energy Solutions II, LLC, JAB Energy Solutions, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)Attorney Miles C. Thomas added to party Allison Marine Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Miles C. Thomas added to party JAB Energy Solutions II, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Miles C. Thomas added to party JAB Energy Solutions, LLC(pty:dft).(Thomas, Miles)
August 12, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Consolidate Case with 21-672 by C-Dive, L.L.C.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Stassi, Robert) Modified on 8/13/2021 (sa). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/16/2021 with corrected Notice of Submission) (sa).
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction and Order referring case to US Magistrate Judge. Judge Lance M Africk terminated. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 08/09/2021.(ko)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. Judge Greg Gerard Guidry, Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 08/04/2021. (NEF: Section I, Mag. 2)(ko)
August 4, 2021 Filing 13 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. **Per the filing attorney, document was filed in error. See record document 11 for correct entry.** (mm)
August 3, 2021 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Consolidate Case With 21-672 re: rec. doc. 11 by C-Dive, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stassi, Robert)
August 3, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Consolidate Case With 21-672 by C-Dive, L.L.C. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Stassi, Robert)
August 3, 2021 Filing 10 **FILED IN ERROR-SEE REC. DOC. 11 FOR CORRECT ENTRY** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Consolidate Cases by C-Dive, L.L.C. (Scotton, David) Modified text on 8/4/2021 (mm).
July 29, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed; JAB Energy Solutions II, LLC served on 7/29/2021, answer due 8/19/2021. (Scotton, David)
July 29, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Allison Marine Holdings, LLC served on 7/29/2021, answer due 8/19/2021. (Scotton, David)
July 29, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; JAB Energy Solutions, LLC served on 7/29/2021, answer due 8/19/2021. (Scotton, David)
July 28, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Allison Marine Holdings, LLC, JAB Energy Solutions II, LLC, JAB Energy Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(bw)
July 27, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Stassi, Robert)
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Stassi, Robert)
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Stassi, Robert)
July 27, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (go)
July 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allison Marine Holdings, LLC, JAB Energy Solutions II, LLC, JAB Energy Solutions, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8968996) filed by C-Dive, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Robert S. Stassi added to party C-Dive, L.L.C.(pty:selreq).(Stassi, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C-Dive, L.L.C. v. JAB Energy Solutions LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C-Dive, L.L.C.
Represented By: Robert S. Stassi
Represented By: David Scotton
Represented By: Peter J. Segrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAB Energy Solutions II, LLC
Represented By: Miles C. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Marine Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Miles C. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAB Energy Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Miles C. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?