Rushton v. Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Glen Otis Rushton, Jr.
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Entergy New Orleans, LLC, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Union Pacific Railroad Company, Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc., Northrop Grumman Ship Systems, Inc., Entergy New Orleans, Inc., New Orleans Public Service, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Taylor-Seidenbach Incorporated, Southern Pacific Transportation Company and Allied Signal
Case Number: 2:2021cv01461
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Dismiss Party. All claims of Plaintiff, Glen Otis Rushton Jr., against Defendant, Taylor-Seidenbach Inc., ONLY, in the above-captioned matter be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees, preserving all rights to proceed against all other defendants and potential parties. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/13/21. (cg)
September 10, 2021 Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. without Prejudice by Glen Otis Rushton, Jr. (Phipps, Charles) Modified on submission date and text 9/10/2021 (cg).
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw. Rec. Doc. 11, Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, is hereby stricken from the record of this proceeding. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/10/21. (cg)
August 31, 2021 Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Document re #11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Glen Otis Rushton, Jr. (Phipps, Charles) Modified referral and submission date on 9/7/2021 (cg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/7/2021: #1 Proposed Order) (cg).
August 31, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Entergy New Orleans, LLC by Glen Otis Rushton, Jr. (Phipps, Charles)
August 31, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Union Pacific Railroad Company by Glen Otis Rushton, Jr. (Phipps, Charles)
August 31, 2021 Filing 11 **STRICKEN PURSUANT ORDER #15 ** NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without as to Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Glen Otis Rushton, Jr. (Phipps, Charles)
August 19, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint #1 Original Petition by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.(Lightfoot, Christopher) Modified link and text on 8/19/2021 (cg).
August 19, 2021 Filing 8 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher)
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Compliance with Court's Directive by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #3 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Boyd, Erin)
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated (Gillen, Laura)
August 12, 2021 Filing 5 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Honeywell International, Inc. (McMillan, Sarah)
August 12, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Honeywell International, Inc..Attorney Sarah Elizabeth McMillan added to party Honeywell International, Inc.(pty:dft).(McMillan, Sarah)
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 DIRECTIVES pursuant to 28:1447(b) by Clerk.(cg)
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (go)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 25th JDC for the Parish of Plaquemines, case number 66-844 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8976153) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)Attorney Erin Helen Boyd added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft).(Boyd, Erin) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/2/2021) (cg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rushton v. Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Represented By: Brian C. Bossier
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Grace, III
Represented By: Edwin A. Ellinghausen, III
Represented By: Erin Helen Boyd
Represented By: Laura M. Gillen
Represented By: Whitney Charmaine Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entergy New Orleans, LLC
Represented By: Cory R. Cahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Kelly Lightfoot
Represented By: Edward J. Lassus, Jr.
Represented By: Gabriel J. Veninata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc.
Represented By: Brian C. Bossier
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Grace, III
Represented By: Edwin A. Ellinghausen, III
Represented By: Erin Helen Boyd
Represented By: Laura M. Gillen
Represented By: Whitney Charmaine Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Ship Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Grace, III
Represented By: Edwin A. Ellinghausen, III
Represented By: Erin Helen Boyd
Represented By: Laura M. Gillen
Represented By: Whitney Charmaine Stewart
Represented By: Brian C. Bossier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entergy New Orleans, Inc.
Represented By: Cory R. Cahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans Public Service, Inc.
Represented By: Cory R. Cahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Deirdre Claire McGlinchey
Represented By: Mark N. Bodin
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach Incorporated
Represented By: Christopher Kelly Lightfoot
Represented By: Edward J. Lassus, Jr.
Represented By: Gabriel J. Veninata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Pacific Transportation Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Signal
Represented By: Deirdre Claire McGlinchey
Represented By: Mark N. Bodin
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Otis Rushton, Jr.
Represented By: Susannah B. Chester-Schindler
Represented By: Charles Ezekiel Joshua Phipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?