Schmill v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Howard Schmill
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv01470
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Roddy, Virginia) Modified on 9/21/2021 (sa).
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, for a twenty (20) day extension of time or until and through 9/21/2021. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/27/2021. (caa)
August 26, 2021 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Virginia N. Roddy added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Roddy, Virginia) Modified on 8/27/2021 (sa).
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to William E. Parsons. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (sa)
August 5, 2021 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice William E. Parsons (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8982529) by Howard Schmill. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit certificate of good standing)(Wanko, D.) Modified text on 8/6/2021 (pp).
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Attachment has duplicate description. For attachment, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action. (bw)
August 5, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (bw)
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (go)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 DEFICIENT. EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8979219) by Howard Schmill. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit certificate of good standing)(Wanko, D.) Modified on 8/5/2021 (bw).
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8979188) filed by Howard Schmill. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet , #2 Summons )Attorney D. Steven Wanko, Jr added to party Howard Schmill(pty:pla).(Wanko, D.) Modified text on 8/5/2021 (bw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schmill v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Schmill
Represented By: D. Steven Wanko, Jr
Represented By: William E. Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Virginia N. Roddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?