Gray v. Meyers
Plaintiff: Brandon Gray, Sr.
Defendant: Marcus Meyers
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Case Number: 2:2021cv01476
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254). The Respondent, through the State of Louisiana, be given an extension of time of thirty (30) days or until Monday, 10/11/2021, to file its response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 9/27/2021. (jls)
September 23, 2021 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Marcus Meyers. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Anne Mary Wallis added to party Marcus Meyers(pty:dft).(Wallis, Anne) Modified text on 9/24/2021 (lw).
August 23, 2021 Filing 5 Return of Service of Habeas Corpus Response Order served on Jefferson Parish District Attorney on 8/13/2021. (sa)
August 20, 2021 Filing 4 Return of Service of Habeas Corpus Response Order served on Jefferson Parish Clerk of Court on 8/16/2021. (sa)
August 17, 2021 Filing 3 Return of Service of Habeas Corpus Response Order served on Louisiana Attorney General on 8/13/2021. (sa)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Habeas Corpus Response Order that Attorney General for the State of Louisiana and the District Attorney for Jefferson Parish respond to the petition of Habeas Corpus within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 8/10/2021.(jls) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/10/2021: #1 Return Receipts for Response Order) (jls).
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (Filing fee $ 5:LAE068770) filed by Brandon Gray, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Gray, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Meyers
Represented By: Anne Mary Wallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?