Clark v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Shaante Clark and Shaante Quinesha Clark
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Hopeman Brothers Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, as Insurer of Wayne Manufacturing, International Paper Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Asbestos Corporation, Ltd., CSR, Ltd, Insurance Company of North America, St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company, Westchester Fire Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Northrup Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc., Northrup Grumman Ship Systems, Inc., Avondale Industries, Inc., Avondale Shipyards, Inc, Avondale Marine Ways, Inc., Hopeman Brothers Inc, CSR Ltd, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and Century Indemnity Company
3Rd Party Defendant: Eagle Inc, Uniroyal Inc, McCarty Corporation and Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust
Case Number: 2:2021cv01483
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Alison A. Spindler by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melancon, David)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ANSWER to #21 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal,,, Third Party Complaint,,, Crossclaim,, by Uniroyal Inc.Attorney Mary Reeves Arthur added to party Uniroyal Inc(pty:3pd).(Arthur, Mary)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING #49 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Amber L. Stewart is hereby WITHDRAWN as counsel of record for defendant International Paper Company in the above-captioned matter and shall be removed from receiving notification of filings through CM/ECF in this matter. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 9/10/2021. (pp)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING #43 MOTION to Continue Submission Date on Plaintiffs Motion to Remand. The submission date for plaintiff's motion to remand set for 9/29/2021 is hereby CONTINUED to 10/13/2021. Pursuant to Local Rule 7.5, defendants' opposition to the motion is due no later than 10/5/2021. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 9/10/2021.(pp)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Amber L. Stewart as Attorney by International Paper Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arthur, Mary) Modified text on 9/10/2021 (pp).
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING #40 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record. David W. O'Quinn is hereby ENROLLED as additional counsel of record for defendant Huntington Ingalls, Inc. in the above-captioned matter. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 9/9/2021. (pp)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion to Dismiss Party. All matters involving defendant Century Indemnity Company in the above-captioned case are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with each party bearing its own cost. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 9/8/2021. (pp)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion to Substitute Motion to Dismiss, Exhibit and Order. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 9/8/2021. (pp)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING #16 MOTION to Dismiss Party St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company . All matters involving defendant St. Paul in the above-captioned case are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with each party bearing its own cost. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 9/8/2021.(pp)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING #18 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims Against Westchester. All matters involving defendant Westchester Fire Insurance Company in the above-captioned case are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with each party bearing its own cost. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 9/8/2021.(pp)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date on Plaintiffs Motion to Remand by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melancon, David)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Summons Issued as to McCarty Corporation. (pp)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Request of Summons Issued as to McCarty Corporation filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #21 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal,,, Third Party Complaint,,, Crossclaim,,. (Melancon, David)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record - David W. OQuinn by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melancon, David)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by International Paper Company (Penn, Elizabeth)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ANSWER to #21 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal,,, Third Party Complaint,,, Crossclaim,, by International Paper Company.(Penn, Elizabeth)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Shaante Quinesha Clark regarding #36 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Colley, Christopher)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Shaante Quinesha Clark. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Notice of Submission)(Colley, Christopher)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ANSWER to #21 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Third Party Complaint,Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.(Lightfoot, Christopher) Modified text on 8/27/2021 (pp).
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Statement of Corporate Disclosure identifying Corporate Parent Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation by Union Carbide Corporation. (Foundas, Ernest) Modified text on 8/23/2021 (pp).
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Lance M Africk recused. Case reassigned to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 08/19/2021. (NEF: Sec. B)(ko)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Wendy B Vitter recused. Case reassigned to Judge Lance M Africk. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 8/18/2021.(jeg)(NEF: Sections D and I)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Summons Issued as to Asbestos Corporation, Ltd., CSR Ltd, Eagle Inc., Insurance Company of North America, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, McCarty Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Uniroyal, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(lw)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Request of Summons Issued as to Union Carbide Corporation filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #21 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Request of Summons Issued as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #21 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Request of Summons Issued as to CSR Ltd filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #21 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Request of Summons Issued as to Insurance Company of North America filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #21 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Request of Summons Issued as to Asbestos Corporation, Ltd. filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #21 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Request of Summons Issued as to Uniroyal, Inc. filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #21 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Request of Summons Issued as to McCarty Corporation filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #21 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Request of Summons Issued as to Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #21 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Request of Summons Issued as to Eagle Inc. filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #21 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Eagle Inc., Uniroyal, Inc., McCarty Corporation, Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, CROSSCLAIM with Jury Demand against Asbestos Corporation, Ltd., CSR Ltd, Hopeman Brothers Inc, Insurance Company of North America, International Paper Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Westchester Fire Insurance Company by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.(Melancon, David)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint Petition for Damages by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc..Attorney Christopher Kelly Lightfoot added to party Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.(pty:dft).(Lightfoot, Christopher) (Main Document 20 replaced on 8/19/2021) (pp).
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims Against Westchester by Westchester Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Angie Arceneaux Akers added to party Westchester Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Akers, Angie)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #15 MOTION to Substitute Motion to Dismiss, Exhibit, and Order. **Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 14. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company by St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guichet, Joseph)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute #14 Motion to Dismiss, Exhibit, and Order by Century Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Motion to Substitute, #2 Proposed Pleading Updated Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit A (Redacted), #4 Proposed Order for Motion to Dismiss)(Curtis, Martha) Modified text/linkage on 8/16/2021 (jeg).
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party Century Indemnity Company Without Prejudice by Century Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Signed Motion to Dismiss Century in State Court, #2 Proposed Order)(Curtis, Martha) (Main Document 14, Attachment 1, and Attachment 2 replaced per Order at rec. doc. 46 on 9/9/2021) (pp).
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated (Melancon, David)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Notice of Compliance 28:USC 14447(b) by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Melancon, David) Modified text on 8/12/2021 (jeg).
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Hopeman Brothers Inc (Ankersen, Brittney)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Petition for Damages by Hopeman Brothers Inc. (Ankersen, Brittney) Modified text on 8/10/2021 (jeg).
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **This document was filed in error and will be noted as such. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Petition for Damages by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.Attorney Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Jalenak, Jay) Modified linkage to reflect link to Notice of Removal on 8/9/2021 (jeg).
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Jalenak, Jay)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 **ERROR- See correct document rec doc 7** Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Jalenak, Jay) Modified on 8/9/2021 (jeg).
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 **DEFICIENT** ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, by Hopeman Brothers Inc..Attorney Brittney Bullock Ankersen added to party Hopeman Brothers Inc.(pty:dft).(Ankersen, Brittney) Modified on 8/9/2021 (jeg).
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DIRECTIVE of the Court pursuant to 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. By the Clerk.(jeg)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. **Filing attorney incorrectly submitted documents that were not properly redacted. Corrected documents subsequently provided to Clerk and images have been replaced. Please ensure to comply with local rules regarding redaction on all future pleadings.** (jeg)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (go)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th Judicial District Court, Jefferson Parish, case number 819-203 Div M (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8982857) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft).(Melancon, David) (Attachment 3 replaced on 8/6/2021) (jeg). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/6/2021) (jeg). (Attachment 5 replaced on 8/6/2021) (jeg). (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/6/2021) (jeg). Modified text on 8/6/2021 (jeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaante Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaante Quinesha Clark
Represented By: David Ryan Cannella
Represented By: Benjamin David Rumph
Represented By: Christopher C. Colley
Represented By: Kristopher Lynn Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Alexander R Saunders
Represented By: Connor Peth
Represented By: David Wayne O'Quinn
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, as Insurer of Wayne Manufacturing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Represented By: Amber L. Stewart
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: David M. Stein
Represented By: Ernest G. Foundas
Represented By: Francis Xavier deBlanc, III
Represented By: Kathleen Erin Jordan
Represented By: Milele N. St. Julien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Kelly Lightfoot
Represented By: Edward J. Lassus, Jr.
Represented By: Gabriel J. Veninata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asbestos Corporation, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSR, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Joseph Pierre Guichet
Represented By: Katherine Osborne Hannan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westchester Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Jay M. Lonero
Represented By: Angie Arceneaux Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick Dale Roquemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrup Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc.
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Alexander R Saunders
Represented By: Connor Peth
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: David Wayne O'Quinn
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrup Grumman Ship Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Alexander R Saunders
Represented By: Connor Peth
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: David Wayne O'Quinn
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avondale Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Alexander R Saunders
Represented By: Connor Peth
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: David Wayne O'Quinn
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avondale Shipyards, Inc
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Alexander R Saunders
Represented By: Connor Peth
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: David Wayne O'Quinn
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avondale Marine Ways, Inc.
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Alexander R Saunders
Represented By: Connor Peth
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: David Wayne O'Quinn
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers Inc
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Blaine Augusta Moore
Represented By: Brittney Bullock Ankersen
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Burg
Represented By: Mathilde Villere Semmes
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSR Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century Indemnity Company
Represented By: James M. Garner
Represented By: Amanda Russo Schenck
Represented By: Elise Benezech
Represented By: Martha Y. Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Eagle Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Uniroyal Inc
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: McCarty Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?