Wilson v. Fleischman
Plaintiff: Vance Keith Wilson, Jr.
Defendant: Daniel Fleischman and Timothy Hooper
Case Number: 2:2021cv01494
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Susie Morgan
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that this habeas corpus case is hereby REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Michael North. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 9/29/2021.(pp)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #4 Petition Pursuant to 28:2241. Respondent is allowed an additional twenty-one (21) days or until 10/18/2021, to produce the state court record and file a response in the above-captioned case. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 9/29/2021. (pp)
September 27, 2021 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #4 Petition by Daniel Fleischman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Matthew Caplan added to party Daniel Fleischman(pty:dft).(Caplan, Matthew) Modified text/link on 9/28/2021 (pp).
September 8, 2021 Filing 6 Return of Service of #5 Order served on Louisiana Attorney General, District Attorney for St. Tammany Parish, Clerk of Court for St. Tammany Parish on 8/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Returned Mail, #2 Returned Mail)(pp)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court serve, by certified mail, a copy of this application and this Order on the Attorney General for the State of Louisiana, the District Attorney, and the Clerk of Court for St. Tammany Parish, Louisiana. IT IS ORDERED that the Attorney General and the District Attorney file an answer to the application, together with a legal memorandum of authorities in support of the answer within thirty (30) days of the date of service. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the District Attorney for St. Tammany Parish, Louisiana shall file with the Court within thirty (30) days of the date of service a certified copy of the entire state court record, including transcripts of all proceedings held in the state courts, as stated herein. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/20/2021.(pp)(CC via certified mail to Attorney General for the State of Louisiana, the District Attorney, and the Clerk of Court for St. Tammany Parish, Louisiana)
August 19, 2021 Filing 4 PETITION Pursuant to 28:2241 filed by Vance Keith Wilson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jls)
August 19, 2021 Filing fee paid from Vance Keith Wilson, Jr re #1 Petition Pursuant to 28:2241 (Filing fee $ 5 - Receipt no. LAE068991) (jls)
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe DOCUMENT: re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Petition Pursuant to 28:2241. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 8/27/2021. (js)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 ***DEFICIENT*** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Vance Keith Wilson, Jr. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (js)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 ***DEFICIENT*** PETITION Pursuant to 28:2241 filed by Vance Keith Wilson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Fleischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vance Keith Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Fleischman
Represented By: Matthew Caplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Hooper
Represented By: Matthew Caplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?