Tate v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Justin Tate
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of North America and UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv01549
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America on 8/20/2021, answer due 10/19/2021. (Toledano, Reagan)
August 17, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (cwa)
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (aj)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Unum Life Insurance Company of North America (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8995169) filed by Justin Tate. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Reagan Levert Toledano added to party Justin Tate(pty:pla).(Toledano, Reagan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tate v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Tate
Represented By: Reagan Levert Toledano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?