Gulf Island Shipyards, LLC v. Mediterranean Shipping Company USA Inc.
Plaintiff: Gulf Island Shipyards, LLC
Defendant: Mediterranean Shipping Company USA Inc. and MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01552
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company USA, Inc. answer due 11/2/2021. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 10/13/2021. (cwa)
October 12, 2021 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Mediterranean Shipping Company USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Steven M. Stastny added to party Mediterranean Shipping Company USA Inc.(pty:dft).(Stastny, Steven) Modified text on 10/13/2021 (cwa).
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mediterranean Shipping Company USA Inc. (sbs)
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (aj)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mediterranean Shipping Company USA Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ALAEDC-8995413) filed by Gulf Island Shipyards, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Etienne Balart added to party Gulf Island Shipyards, LLC(pty:pla).(Balart, Etienne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gulf Island Shipyards, LLC v. Mediterranean Shipping Company USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gulf Island Shipyards, LLC
Represented By: Etienne Balart
Represented By: Sara Barry Kuebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mediterranean Shipping Company USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company USA, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. Stastny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?