Starr Indemnity & Liability Company v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv01640
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition to re #7 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rayer, Thomas) Modified text on 10/20/2021 (pp).
September 28, 2021 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 MOTION to Transfer Case .** Filing attorney selected incorrect submission date. Correct date is 10/27/2021. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary.** (pp)
September 27, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Transfer Case by Union Pacific Railroad Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Notice of Submission)(Courtney, Pamela) Modified text on 9/28/2021 (pp).
September 24, 2021 Filing 6 DEFICIENT. MOTION to Transfer Case by Union Pacific Railroad Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Courtney, Pamela) Modified on 9/27/2021 (bw).
September 24, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Compliance by Union Pacific Railroad Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Courtney, Pamela) Modified text/link on 9/27/2021 (bw).
September 14, 2021 Filing 4 Directive by the Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. (pp)
August 27, 2021 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure identifying Corporate Parent Union Pacific Corporation for Union Pacific Railroad Company by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Courtney, Pamela) Modified text on 9/8/2021 (pp).
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th Judicial District Court, Jefferson Parish, LA, case number 819-628 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9015284) filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 State Court Pleadings)Attorney Pamela L. Courtney added to party Union Pacific Railroad Company(pty:dft).(Courtney, Pamela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Represented By: Thomas Arnoult Rayer, Jr.
Represented By: Christian St. Martin
Represented By: Michael H. Bagot, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Pamela L. Courtney
Represented By: David Andrew Fraser
Represented By: Ashley Boutte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?