Franco's Athletic Club LLC et al v. Davis et al
Plaintiff: Franco's Athletic Club LLC, Franco Investments LLC, Spa Management Systems LLC, Ronald Franco, Sandra Franco, Fitcorp LLC and Franco's Athletic Club, LLC
Defendant: Emily David, Jennifer Thompson, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Princeton Excess and Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Emily L Davis and International Insurance Company of Hannover SE
Case Number: 2:2021cv01647
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, International Insurance Company of Hannover SE, Lexington Insurance Company, Princeton Excess and Surplus Lines Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company re #5 First MOTION to Remand to State Court 22nd Judicial District for St. Tammany Parish . (Rew, Phillip)
September 24, 2021 Filing 5 First MOTION to Remand to State Court 22nd Judicial District for St. Tammany Parish by Fitcorp LLC, Ronald Franco, Sandra Franco, Franco Investments LLC, Franco's Athletic Club, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Notice of Submission)Attorney Willard O. Lape, III added to party Fitcorp LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Willard O. Lape, III added to party Ronald Franco(pty:cd), Attorney Willard O. Lape, III added to party Sandra Franco(pty:cd), Attorney Willard O. Lape, III added to party Franco Investments LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Willard O. Lape, III added to party Franco's Athletic Club, LLC(pty:cd).(Lape, Willard)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Princeton Excess and Surplus Lines Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Notice of Submission, #7 Proposed Order)(Rew, Phillip) Modified filers on 9/17/2021 (jls).
September 7, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (sek)
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint Original Petition and First and Second Supplemental and Amending Petitions, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Lexington Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Princeton Excess and Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company.(Hoefer, Bruce) Modified text on 9/8/2021 (jls).
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd Judicial District Court, case number 2017-12671 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9015899) filed by HDI Global Specialty SE, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)Attorney Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr added to party General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr added to party HDI Global Specialty SE(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr added to party Indian Harbor Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr added to party Lexington Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr added to party Princeton Excess and Surplus Lines Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr added to party QBE Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr added to party Steadfast Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr added to party United Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Hoefer, Bruce) Modified text/filers on 9/7/2021 (jls).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franco's Athletic Club LLC et al v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franco's Athletic Club LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franco Investments LLC
Represented By: Willard O. Lape, III
Represented By: Nicole M. Babb
Represented By: Timothy S. Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spa Management Systems LLC
Represented By: Willard O. Lape, III
Represented By: Nicole M. Babb
Represented By: Timothy S. Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Franco
Represented By: Willard O. Lape, III
Represented By: Nicole M. Babb
Represented By: Timothy S. Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Franco
Represented By: Willard O. Lape, III
Represented By: Nicole M. Babb
Represented By: Timothy S. Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fitcorp LLC
Represented By: Willard O. Lape, III
Represented By: Nicole M. Babb
Represented By: Timothy S. Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franco's Athletic Club, LLC
Represented By: Willard O. Lape, III
Represented By: Nicole M. Babb
Represented By: Timothy S. Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Thompson
Represented By: Alex J. Peragine
Represented By: Christina F. Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle M. Truxillo
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HDI Global Specialty SE
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle M. Truxillo
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle M. Truxillo
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle M. Truxillo
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle M. Truxillo
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steadfast Insurance Company
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle M. Truxillo
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle M. Truxillo
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle M. Truxillo
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princeton Excess and Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle M. Truxillo
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily L Davis
Represented By: Richard Gary Higgins
Represented By: Shannon K. Lowry
Represented By: Vincent F. Wynne, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Insurance Company of Hannover SE
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle M. Truxillo
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?