In the Matter of: Maintenance Dredging I, L.L.C. et al
Petitioner: Maintenance Dredging I, L.L.C. and Maintenance Dredging, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01648
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 30504
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER APPROVING LIMITATION PLAINTIFFS' DECLARATIONS OF VALUATION, SECURITY, AND AD INTERIM STIPULATION AND DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE TO CLAIMANTS AND RESTRAINING PROSECUTION OF CLAIMS. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 9/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Claimants) (jls)
September 20, 2021 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Order Approving Petitioners' Security, Declarations of Valuation, and Ad Interim Stipulation and Directing Issuance of Notice to Claimants and Restraining Prosecution of Claims by Maintenance Dredging I, L.L.C., Maintenance Dredging, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ad Interim Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order)(McMahon, Michael)
September 20, 2021 Filing 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT For Exoneration from or Alternatively Limitation of Liability against Maintenance Dredging, Inc. filed by Maintenance Dredging I, L.L.C., Maintenance Dredging, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McMahon, Michael)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that Limitation Plaintiffs requests for injunctive relief and for the Court to set a monition period are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. FURTHER ORDERED that Limitation Plaintiffs are given until 9/27/2021 to file an amended complaint complying with Rule F. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 9/9/2021.(caa)
September 7, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (sek)
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Order Approving Petitioners' Security, Declarations of Value, Ad Interim Stipulation, and Directing Issuance of Notice to Claimants and Restraining Prosecution of Claims by Maintenance Dredging I, L.L.C., Maintenance Dredging, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Ad Interim Stipulation, #3 Security, #4 Notice to Claimants)Attorney Michael William McMahon added to party Maintenance Dredging, Inc.(pty:pet).(McMahon, Michael) Modified text on 9/7/2021 (jls).
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR ALTERNATIVELY LIMITATION OF LIABILITY (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9015970) filed by Maintenance Dredging I, L.L.C. and Maintenance Dredging, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Declaration, #3 Affidavit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)Attorney Michael William McMahon added to party Maintenance Dredging I, L.L.C.(pty:pet).(McMahon, Michael) Modified on 9/7/2021 (jls).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the Matter of: Maintenance Dredging I, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maintenance Dredging I, L.L.C.
Represented By: Michael William McMahon
Represented By: Ryan M. Bourgeois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maintenance Dredging, Inc.
Represented By: Michael William McMahon
Represented By: Ryan M. Bourgeois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?