Innovative Sports Management Inc v. Lower D Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media and Innovative Sports Management Inc doing business as Integrated Sports Media
Defendant: Lower D Group, LLC d/b/a American Sports Saloon, James E. Book, Robert Mendoza, Lower D Group, LLC doing business as American Sports Saloon and Jim E. Book
Case Number: 2:2021cv01649
Filed: August 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 0605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Allen Pare on behalf of James E. Book, Lower D Group, LLC, Robert Mendoza. (Pare, Matthew)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew Allen Pare. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 10/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (cwa)
October 20, 2021 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Matthew A. Pare (Filing fee $100 receipt number ALAEDC-9071003) by James E. Book, Lower D Group, LLC, Robert Mendoza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Atty Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Colon, Adrian) Modified text on 10/20/2021 (cwa).
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: All discovery must be completed by 3/11/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/12/2022 at 3:30 PM before Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon. Bench Trial set for 5/23/2022 at 9:00 AM before Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form) (NEF: Magistrate Judge)(sbs)
October 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE - Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2021 at 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(sbs)
September 30, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by James E. Book, Lower D Group, LLC, Robert Mendoza. Attorney Adrian Anthony Colon, Jr added to party James E. Book(pty:dft), Attorney Adrian Anthony Colon, Jr added to party Lower D Group, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Adrian Anthony Colon, Jr added to party Robert Mendoza(pty:dft).(Colon, Adrian) Modified text on 10/1/2021 (cwa).
September 8, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to James E. Book, Lower D Group, LLC, Robert Mendoza. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(sbs)
September 7, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
August 28, 2021 Filing 2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media (Berthelot, Ronnie)
August 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9016027) filed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)Attorney Ronnie J. Berthelot added to party Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media(pty:pla).(Berthelot, Ronnie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Sports Management Inc v. Lower D Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media
Represented By: Ronnie J. Berthelot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management Inc doing business as Integrated Sports Media
Represented By: Ronnie J. Berthelot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lower D Group, LLC d/b/a American Sports Saloon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Book
Represented By: Adrian Anthony Colon, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew Allen Pare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Mendoza
Represented By: Adrian Anthony Colon, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew Allen Pare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lower D Group, LLC doing business as American Sports Saloon
Represented By: Adrian Anthony Colon, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew Allen Pare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim E. Book
Represented By: Adrian Anthony Colon, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew Allen Pare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?