Pigott v.Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Donelle Pigott
Defendant: Comm. of SSA Andrew Saul and Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2021cv01702
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Social Security Administration served on 10/4/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. (Meunier, Adam) Modified text on 10/25/2021 (pp).
October 15, 2021 Filing 6 **DEFICIENT**SUMMONS Returned Executed; Social Security Administration served on 9/29/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (Meunier, Adam) Modified on 10/18/2021 (pp).
September 20, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(jls)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 9/19/2021. (jls) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2021: #1 Pauper Letter) (jls).
September 16, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (aj)
September 16, 2021 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donelle Pigott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 IN FORMA PAUPERIS)(Meunier, Adam)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul (In Forma Pauperis status requested) filed by Donelle Pigott. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)Attorney Adam Meunier added to party Donelle Pigott(pty:pla).(Meunier, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pigott v.Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donelle Pigott
Represented By: Adam Meunier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comm. of SSA Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?