John W. Stone Oil Distributor, L.L.C. v. SO Trading, LLC et al
Plaintiff: John W. Stone Oil Distributor, L.L.C.
Defendant: SO Trading, LLC, TXSO Companies, Inc., SO Trading, LLC doing business as Source Oil Trading, LLC and TXSO Companies, Inc. doing business as Source Oil Companies, Inc doing business as Source Oil & Asphalt Supply
Case Number: 2:2021cv01712
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed; TXSO Companies, Inc. served on 11/11/2021, answer due 12/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service of Amended Verified Complaint)(DeGruy, Jacques)
November 15, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed; SO Trading, LLC served on 11/11/2021, answer due 12/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service of Amended Verified Complaint)(DeGruy, Jacques)
November 10, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to SO Trading, LLC, TXSO Companies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(am)
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT IN ADMIRALTY against SO Trading, LLC, TXSO Companies, Inc. filed by John W. Stone Oil Distributor, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Summons to SO Trading, LLC d/b/a Source Oil Trading, LLC, #3 Summons to TXSO Companies, Inc., d/b/a Source Oil Companies, Inc. d/b/a Source Oil & Asphalt Supply)(DeGruy, Jacques)
September 27, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to SO Trading, LLC, TXSO Companies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(am)
September 27, 2021 Filing 4 Request of Summons Issued as to TXSO Companies, Inc. filed by John W. Stone Oil Distributor, L.L.C. re #1 Complaint,. (DeGruy, Jacques)
September 27, 2021 Filing 3 Request of Summons Issued as to SO Trading, LLC filed by John W. Stone Oil Distributor, L.L.C. re #1 Complaint,. (DeGruy, Jacques)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (aj)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SO Trading, LLC, TXSO Companies, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9030932) filed by John W. Stone Oil Distributor, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Robert R. Johnston added to party John W. Stone Oil Distributor, L.L.C.(pty:pla).(Johnston, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John W. Stone Oil Distributor, L.L.C. v. SO Trading, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John W. Stone Oil Distributor, L.L.C.
Represented By: Robert R. Johnston
Represented By: Constance C Waguespack
Represented By: Jacques P. DeGruy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SO Trading, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TXSO Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SO Trading, LLC doing business as Source Oil Trading, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TXSO Companies, Inc. doing business as Source Oil Companies, Inc doing business as Source Oil & Asphalt Supply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?