Stansberry v. Attorney General State of Louisiana
Plaintiff: Hunter Deagun Stansberry
Defendant: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Case Number: 2:2021cv01750
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the clerk of court terminate the deficiency assigned to petitioners pauper application (ECF No. 2) for purposes of entering this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner's #2 motion is DENIED for failure to properly complete and submit the required pauper application with the necessary personal and inmate account information required to assess his pauper application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 11/1/2021.(jeg)
September 23, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 10/14/2021. (js)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 ***DEFICIENT*** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Hunter Deagun Stansberry. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (js)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 ***DEFICIENT*** PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) filed by Hunter Deagun Stansberry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stansberry v. Attorney General State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hunter Deagun Stansberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?