SCF Marine Inc. v. WATCO Transloading, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: SCF Marine, Inc.
Defendant: WATCO Transloading, L.L.C., Parker Towing Company, Inc. and SSA Marine Inc
Not Classified By Court: SCF Marine Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01768
Filed: September 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER of Consolidation. It, having come to the Court's attention that C.A. No. 21-1342, In the Matter of SCF Marine, Inc. is related to the above case, IT IS ORDERED that the above matters are hereby CONSOLIDATED. Pursuant to the Court's directive, all pleadings hereafter filed in this consolidated proceeding shall bear the caption of the Master consolidated case together with the docket number of all cases within the consolidation to which the document applies or the notation "ALL CASES" if it applies to all cases. Master case is 21-1342 J. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/29/21.(cg)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Giles B. Howard. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/28/21. (cg)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. Judge Eldon E. Fallon, Magistrate Judge Michael North no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/27/2021.(cwa)
September 27, 2021 Filing 10 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by SCF Marine Inc. identifying Corporate Parent SEACOR Inland River Transport Inc., Seacor Holdings, Inc., and Safari Parent, Inc. for SCF Marine Inc. (Sutherland, Dean) Modified text/corporate parent or other affiliates on 9/28/2021 (cwa).
September 27, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Parker Towing Company, Inc., SSA Marine Inc, WATCO Transloading, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(cwa)
September 27, 2021 Filing 8 Request of Summons Issued as to SSA Marine Inc filed by SCF Marine Inc. re #1 Complaint. (Sutherland, Dean) Modified text on 9/27/2021 (cwa).
September 27, 2021 Filing 7 Request of Summons Issued as to WATCO Transloading, L.L.C. filed by SCF Marine Inc. re #1 Complaint. (Sutherland, Dean) Modified text on 9/27/2021 (cwa).
September 27, 2021 Filing 6 Request of Summons Issued as to Parker Towing Company, Inc. filed by SCF Marine Inc. re #1 Complaint. (Sutherland, Dean) Modified text on 9/27/2021 (cwa).
September 27, 2021 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint, #2 Complaint. Filing attorney entered the Civil Cover Sheet as the Main Document and filed the Complaint as a separate docket entry. The Complaint should be the Main Document and the Civil Cover Sheet should be an attachment. Clerk took corrective action by replacing the images. No further action necessary. Additionally, filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have the pink header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (cwa)
September 27, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (aj)
September 24, 2021 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Giles B. Howard (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-9039362) by SCF Marine Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Sutherland, Dean)
September 24, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Parker Towing Company, Inc., SSA Marine Inc, WATCO Transloading, L.L.C. (Fee previously paid) filed by SCF Marine Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sutherland, Dean)
September 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Parker Towing Company, Inc., SSA Marine Inc, WATCO Transloading, L.L.C. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9039332) filed by SCF Marine Inc..(Sutherland, Dean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCF Marine Inc. v. WATCO Transloading, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SCF Marine Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATCO Transloading, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Towing Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSA Marine Inc
Represented By: Peter Brooks Sloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCF Marine, Inc.
Represented By: Dean A. Sutherland
Represented By: Giles B. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?